Stegall, II v. Viars et al
Plaintiff: Jack Stegall, II and Gina Davis Stegall
Defendant: Kourtney Viars, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Des Moines, Iowa, CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, Corporate Secretary General Mills, Inc., Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., CTA Pizza Inc. and General Mills, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00627
Filed: February 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
2 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 19, 2019 Reset deadlines pursuant to #27 as to Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota: Answer due 4/26/2019. (ew)
April 19, 2019 Filing 27 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Move, Plead, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs' Amended Complaint by Defendant Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00160-MHW-EPD, 2:19-cv-00627-MHW-EPD (French, Erin)
April 2, 2019 Filing 26 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, CTA Pizza Inc., Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Kourtney Viars, CTA Pizza Inc., Corporate Secretary General Mills, Inc., Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, filed by Gina Davis Stegall, Jack Stegall, II. (jlk) (jlk).
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting (32) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:19-cv-00160-MHW-EPD; granting (24) Motion to Amend/Correct in case 2:19-cv-00627-MHW-EPD. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 2, 2019. (jlk)
April 1, 2019 Filing 24 MOTION to Amend/Correct ( Responses due by 4/22/2019) by Plaintiffs Gina Davis Stegall, Jack Stegall, II, Gina Davis Stegall, Jack Stegall, II. (Attachments: #1 Amended Complaint) Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00160-MHW-EPD, 2:19-cv-00627-MHW-EPD (Warren, Michael)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - The Amended Complaints (Case No. 2:19-cv-160, 29 and Case No. 2:19-cv-627, #21 ) are STRICKEN. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to file a new Motion for Leave to Amended Complaint naming both Blue Cross Blue Shield of Minnesota and General Mills, Inc. in the caption of the case and asserting substantive claims against each of them by APRIL 5, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 29, 2019. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00160-MHW-EPD, 2:19-cv-00627-MHW-EPD (jlk)
March 28, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #13 Crossclaim of Blue Cross Blue Shield of Minnesota filed by CTA Pizza Inc. and Kourtney Viars. (ew)
March 28, 2019 Filing 21 STRICKEN PER ORDER #23 ***AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, CTA Pizza Inc., Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Des Moines, Iowa, Kourtney Viars, Corporate Secretary General Mills, Inc., filed by Jack Stegall, II, Gina Davis Stegall. (jlk) Modified on 3/29/2019 (jlk).
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Amend/Correct. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 28, 2019. (jlk)
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER - Memorializing telephonic status conference on March 27, 2019. Amended Pleadings due by 4/3/2019. The parties do not oppose Plaintiffs Motion for Leave to Amend. The Court will hold Plaintiffs Motion to Dismiss Blue Cross Blue Shield in abeyance until General Mills makes an appearance and can adequately defend on the subrogation claims and, as set forth below, Blue Cross Blue Shield dismisses its cross-claims against Defendants Viars and CTA Pizza. Blue Cross Blue Shield will, either by stipulation or motion, dismiss its cross-claims against Defendants Viars and CTA Pizza. The Court ORDERS Blue Cross Blue Shield to do so within SEVEN (7) DAYS of General Mills appearance. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on March 28, 2019. (jlk)
March 27, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers: Status Conference held on 3/27/2019. Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00160-MHW-EPD, 2:19-cv-00627-MHW-EPD (sln)
March 27, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint ( Responses due by 4/17/2019) by Plaintiffs Gina Davis Stegall, Jack Stegall, II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) Associated Cases: 2:19-cv-00160-MHW-EPD, 2:19-cv-00627-MHW-EPD (Warren, Michael)
March 25, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 3/27/2019 02:00 PM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER construing (22 in 2:19-cv-160) and (14 in 2:19-cv-627) as motions to voluntarily dismiss without prejudice under FRCP 21. Responses due by 4/1/2019. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/25/2019. (ew)
March 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting (14 in case 2:19-cv-160), (3 in case 2:19-cv-627) Motion to Consolidate Cases. All future filings shall be docketed in 2:19-cv-160. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/25/2019. (ew)
March 22, 2019 Filing 14 Motion to Voluntarily Dismiss by Plaintiff Jack Stegall, II (Warren, Michael) Modified text and event on 3/25/2019 (ew).
March 8, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint , CROSSCLAIM against CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Kourtney Viars filed by Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota. (French, Erin)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:19-cv-627 and 2:19-cv-160 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge Michael H. Watson for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael H. Watson on March 4, 2019. (jlk)
March 1, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #6 Answer to Complaint, Crossclaim of Defendant Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company filed by CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Kourtney Viars. (Burnett, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint filed by Kourtney Viars. (Burnett, John)
March 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #7 Amended Complaint filed by CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza. (Burnett, John)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Des Moines, Iowa, Kourtney Viars, General Mills, Inc., filed by Jack Stegall, II. (jlk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #5 Complaint, and CROSSCLAIM against CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Kourtney Viars filed by Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Des Moines, Iowa. (jlk)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota, CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Des Moines, Iowa, Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc., Kourtney Viars, filed by Jack Stegall, II. (jlk)
February 25, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by John W. Burnett for Defendants CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Kourtney Viars (Burnett, John)
February 25, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza, Kourtney Viars. (Bentz, Audrey)
February 22, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza. (Janik, Steven)
February 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas, Franklin County, Ohio, case number 19CV000199 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6808029), filed by CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza. (Attachments: #1 Pleadings from Court of Common Pleas, Franklin County, Ohio, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Janik, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stegall, II v. Viars et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kourtney Viars
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Represented By: John W. Burnett
Represented By: Audrey K Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationwide Agribusiness Insurance Company, Des Moines, Iowa
Represented By: Anna Kathleen Locurto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTA Pizza Inc. T.A. Domino's Pizza
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blue Cross and Blue Shield of Minnesota
Represented By: Erin Dwyer French
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporate Secretary General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sedgwick Claims Management Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CTA Pizza Inc.
Represented By: Steven G Janik
Represented By: John W. Burnett
Represented By: Audrey K Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Mills, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Stegall, II
Represented By: Michael William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gina Davis Stegall
Represented By: Michael William Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?