Akuranvyka USA, Inc. v. Vishal Patel Restaurant Group, LLC
Plaintiff: (dba Curry Up Now) Akuranvyka USA, Inc.
Defendant: Vishal Patel Restaurant Group, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv00667
Filed: February 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Vishal Patel Restaurant Group, LLC on 4/4/2019, answer due 6/3/2019. (King, Andrew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Vishal Patel Restaurant Group, LLC. (daf)
February 25, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff (dba Curry Up Now) Akuranvyka USA, Inc.. (Shumate, Keith)
February 25, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Vishal Patel Restaurant Group, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6810159), filed by (dba Curry Up Now) Akuranvyka USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Summons Form, #6 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shumate, Keith)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Akuranvyka USA, Inc. v. Vishal Patel Restaurant Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: (dba Curry Up Now) Akuranvyka USA, Inc.
Represented By: Keith Shumate
Represented By: Andrew H King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vishal Patel Restaurant Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?