Medallion Import, LLC v. Technology From Heaven Unlimited et al
Plaintiff: Medallion Import, LLC
Defendant: Hope for Homeless Youth, Technology From Heaven Unlimited and Clayton Golliher
Case Number: 2:2019cv00680
Filed: February 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
2 Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
3 Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2019. Motions to Amend due by 6/1/2019. Rule 26(a)(1) Disclosures due by 5/9/2019. Primary Expert due by 10/31/2019. Rebuttal Expert due by 11/30/2019. Discovery due by 10/31/2019. Dispositive motions due by 11/30/2019. Settlement Demand due by 12/31/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 26, 2019. (jlk)
April 25, 2019 Notice: The 4/25/2019 at 11:30 AM PPTC is VACATED. (See ECF No. #19 .) (sln)
April 23, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative for a Convenience Transfer of the Action, Against Plaintiff. Responses due by 5/1/2019 (jlk)
April 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. Plaintiff shall have until MAY 1, 2019, in which to respond to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss #16 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 23, 2019. (jlk)
April 23, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/1/2019. by Plaintiff Medallion Import, LLC. (Lech, Robert)
April 19, 2019 Filing 19 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Medallion Import, LLC. (Lech, Robert)
April 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Terran T. Steinhart. Defendants' Motion to designate Attorney Steinhart as trial attorney (id.) is GRANTED IN PART to the extent that Attorney Terran T. Steinhart may serve as trial attorney for the purposes of all pretrial proceedings. Should the case proceed to trial, counsels status as trial attorney will be at the discretion of the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on April 4, 2019. (jlk)
April 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6866733) of Terran T. Steinhart by Defendants Clayton Golliher, Hope for Homeless Youth, Technology From Heaven Unlimited. (Hertlein, Douglas)
April 3, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction or in the Alternative for a Convenience Transfer of the Action, Against Plaintiff by Defendants Clayton Golliher, Hope for Homeless Youth, Technology From Heaven Unlimited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Clayton Golliher) (Hertlein, Douglas)
March 27, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Clayton Golliher answer due 4/3/2019; Hope for Homeless Youth answer due 4/3/2019; Technology From Heaven Unlimited answer due 4/3/2019. (er)
March 27, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION Second Stipulation Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants Clayton Golliher, Hope for Homeless Youth, Technology From Heaven Unlimited. (Hertlein, Douglas)
March 21, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/25/2019 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
March 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines: : Defendants' answer to complaint due by 3/27/2019. (sln)
March 20, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Complaint by Defendants Clayton Golliher, Hope for Homeless Youth, Technology From Heaven Unlimited. (Hertlein, Douglas)
March 6, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Clayton Golliher, Hope for Homeless Youth, and Technology From Heaven Unlimited. Served on 2/27/2019. Answers due 3/20/2019. (Lech, Robert) Modified text on 3/6/2019 (ew).
March 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiff Medallion Import, LLC re #1 Amended Complaint, #6 Complaint, Civil Cover Sheet (Lech, Robert)
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:16-1146 ARE related. Case reassigned to Judge James L. Graham and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge James L. Graham and Judge Michael H. Watson on 3/5/2019. (er)
February 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Technology From Heaven Unlimited, Hope for Homeless Youth, and Clayton Golliher. (ew)
February 26, 2019 Filing 6 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6811542), filed by Medallion Import, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - TFHU Web Site, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - HFHY Web Site, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Notice, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Affidavit) (Lech, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Medallion Import, LLC. (Lech, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Lech, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Lech, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Lech, Robert)
February 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants, filed by Medallion Import, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A - TFHU Web Site, #2 Exhibit Ex. B - HFHY Web Site, #3 Exhibit Ex. C - Notice, #4 Exhibit Ex. D - Affidavit) (Lech, Robert) Modified text on 2/26/2019 (ew).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Medallion Import, LLC v. Technology From Heaven Unlimited et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hope for Homeless Youth
Represented By: Douglas Lee Hertlein
Represented By: Terran T. Steinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Technology From Heaven Unlimited
Represented By: Douglas Lee Hertlein
Represented By: Terran T. Steinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clayton Golliher
Represented By: Douglas Lee Hertlein
Represented By: Terran T. Steinhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Medallion Import, LLC
Represented By: Robert Raymond Lech
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?