Nasdeo et al v. Selene Finance, L.P. et al

Plaintiff: Steven Nasdeo and Kelly Nasdeo
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company and Selene Finance, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00739
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company. (Harrison, Gregory)
April 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/16/2019 11:00 AM in Courtroom 220 - Columbus before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
April 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company. Answer now due 4/22/2019. (sem)
April 1, 2019 Filing 5 STIPULATION -Stipulated Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Plead by Defendant Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company. (Harrison, Gregory)
March 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel Aaron Cox for Defendant Selene Finance, L.P. (Cox, Daniel)
March 19, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Selene Finance, L.P. on 3/19/2019, answer due 5/20/2019. (Flick, Brian)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company, Selene Finance, L.P. (er)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company, Selene Finance, L.P. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6819127), filed by Steven Nasdeo, Kelly Nasdeo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Loan Mod to R. Folland, #2 Exhibit NOE to Selene- Misapplication of Payments, #3 Exhibit Selene Response to Payoff, #4 Exhibit Mortgage Statements, #5 Exhibit Selene Letter re. Cancelation of Insurance Policy, #6 Exhibit Selene Ntc Insurance Expired, #7 Exhibit Selene 2nd Ntc Insurance Expired, #8 Exhibit Selene Final Ntc of Insurance Policy Expired, #9 Civil Cover Sheet, #10 Summons Form, #11 Summons Form) (Flick, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nasdeo et al v. Selene Finance, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goldman Sachs Mortgage Company
Represented By: Gregory Alan Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Selene Finance, L.P.
Represented By: Daniel Aaron Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Nasdeo
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: Daniel M. Solar
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Nasdeo
Represented By: Brian Flick
Represented By: Daniel M. Solar
Represented By: Marc E Dann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?