Blanchard et al v. Impact Community Action

Plaintiff: Tracie Harrison and Balisia Blanchard
Defendant: Impact Community Action
Case Number: 2:2019cv00746
Filed: March 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1446
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Defendant Impact Community Action. (Courtwright, Angela)
April 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 5/20/2019 at 11:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm)
April 2, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiffs Balisia Blanchard, Tracie Harrison. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Stepter, Rayl)
March 1, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Defendant Impact Community Action re #1 Notice of Removal, (Courtwright, Angela)
March 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 17CV004120 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6819253), filed by Impact Community Action. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A State Court Pleadings, #2 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Courtwright, Angela)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Blanchard et al v. Impact Community Action
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracie Harrison
Represented By: Rayl L Stepter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Balisia Blanchard
Represented By: Rayl L Stepter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impact Community Action
Represented By: Angela Courtwright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?