Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Wettee aka Eddie Wettee et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: New Management Group LLC and Edet Wettee aka Eddie Wettee
Case Number: 2:2019cv00794
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:553
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: New Management Group LLC answer due 5/10/2019; Edet Wettee aka Eddie Wettee answer due 5/10/2019. (jlk)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to New Management Group LLC on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Edet Wettee aka Eddie Wettee on 3/12/2019, answer due 5/13/2019. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
March 8, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Edet Wettee aka Eddie Wettee. (jlk)
March 8, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to New Management Group LLC. (jlk)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Koberg, Jeffrey)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6825627), filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Edet Wettee, #3 Summons Form New Management Group LLC) (Koberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Wettee aka Eddie Wettee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Management Group LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edet Wettee aka Eddie Wettee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: Jeffrey L Koberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?