Harvey v. Davol, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Harvey
Defendant: Davol, Inc. and C.R. Bard Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv00932
Filed: March 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
0 Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
1 Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 13, 2019 Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (daf)
March 13, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of Missouri Eastern; Case Number 4:18-cv-02141. Original file electronic copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: Southern District of Ohio. Case transferred via CM/ECF extraction. (DLB) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 6. Mon Mar 11 11:43:30 CDT 2019 (Phillips, Nicole) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER regarding multidistrict litigation by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Judge Unassigned on 3/11/2019. (NEP) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
March 1, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Jerry Lee Harvey. Davol, Inc. served on 2/20/2019, answer due 3/13/2019. (KXS) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Summons Issued as to defendant All Defendants. The summons was hand delivered to USMS. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 4. Wed Feb 13 14:30:43 CST 2019 (Kratzer, Katie) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
February 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that plaintiff's motion to proceed in forma pauperis, #2 , is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order, plaintiff must pay an initial filing fee of $13.16. Plaintiff is instructed to make his remittance payable to Clerk, United States District Court, and to include upon it: (1) his name; (2) his prison registration number; (3) the case number; and (4) the statement that the remittance is for an original proceeding. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant Davol, Inc. [SEE ORDER FOR ADDRESS] IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall issue process or cause process to issue upon the complaint as to defendant C.R. Bard, Inc. [SEE ORDER FOR ADDRESS]. Signed by District Judge Rodney W. Sippel on 2/13/19. (KEK) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
December 27, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Dec 27 09:01:11 CST 2018 (admin,) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
December 27, 2018 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
December 27, 2018 Case Opening Notification: All non-governmental organizational parties (corporations, limited liability companies, limited liability partnerships) must file Disclosure of Organizational Interests Certificate # (moed-0001.pdf). Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney W. Sippel. (JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 3 Non-Certified Inmate Account Statement by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Harvey. (JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Jerry Lee Harvey. (JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]
December 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant C.R. Bard, Inc., Davol, Inc., Jury Demand, filed by Jerry Lee Harvey. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summonses (Clerk's note: summons are not form AO-0440 and are created by plaintiff, #3 Envelope)(JWD) [Transferred from Missouri Eastern on 3/13/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harvey v. Davol, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Davol, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C.R. Bard Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerry Lee Harvey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?