Arnold Yerkes v. Ohio State Highway Patrol et al

Plaintiff: Stacey Arnold Yerkes
Defendant: Michael Kemmer, Gene Smith, William Stidham, Scott Wyckhouse and Ohio State Highway Patrol
Case Number: 2:2019cv02047
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Scott Wyckhouse on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Starling, Jason)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to William Stidham on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Starling, Jason)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Michael Kemmer on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Starling, Jason)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Gene Smith on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Starling, Jason)
June 17, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Ohio State Highway Patrol on 5/20/2019, answer due 7/19/2019. (Starling, Jason)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Michael Kemmer, Ohio State Highway Patrol, Gene Smith, William Stidham, and Scott Wyckhouse. (daf)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Michael Kemmer, Ohio State Highway Patrol, Gene Smith, William Stidham, Scott Wyckhouse ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6931055), filed by Stacey Arnold Yerkes. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Form, #5 Summons Form, #6 Summons Form, #7 Summons Form, #8 Summons Form) (Starling, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Arnold Yerkes v. Ohio State Highway Patrol et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Kemmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gene Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Stidham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Wyckhouse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio State Highway Patrol
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacey Arnold Yerkes
Represented By: Jason E Starling
Represented By: John C Camillus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?