Martin v. Lowe's Home Centers. LLC
Plaintiff: William A. Martin
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers. LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02051
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 7/11/2019. Initial Disclosures due by 7/11/2019. Primary Expert due by 3/31/2020. Rebuttal expert reports due 5/18/2020. Discovery due by 11/15/2019. Dispositive motions due by 12/13/2019. Settlement Demand due by 6/25/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/9/2019. Mediation Deadline: 4/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 18, 2019. (jlk)
June 17, 2019 NOTICE: The PPTC set for 6/18/2019 at 11:00 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No. #6 .) (sln)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Lowe's Home Centers. LLC & Plaintiff William A. Martin (Sanderson, Jessica) Modified filing parties on 6/12/2019 (kk)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND filed originally in Franklin County CPC on 4/24/2019 by William A. Martin against Lowe's Home Centers. LLC. (er)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 6/18/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
May 20, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to #5 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Lowe's Home Centers. LLC. (Resetar, Nicholas) Modified and created link on 5/22/2019 (er).
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Lowe's Home Centers. LLC, Lowe's Companies Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers. LLC.. (Resetar, Nicholas)
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV003412 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6931693), filed by Lowe's Home Centers. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit State Court Documents) (Resetar, Nicholas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Martin v. Lowe's Home Centers. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lowe's Home Centers. LLC
Represented By: Nicholas Pavel Resetar
Represented By: Jessica Lynn Sanderson
Represented By: Tyler Martin Jolley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William A. Martin
Represented By: James E.L. Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?