AKF Inc v. 12 Stone Contracting Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: AKF INC., d/b/a FUNDKITE and AKF Inc
Defendant: RSFF, LLC, d/b/a 12 STONE NORTH, 12 STONE CONTRACTING GROUP, INC. and RSFF, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv02176
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/6/2019 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
July 1, 2019 Filing 16 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Ramsey A Knowles (kk2)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTATION ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer as to all Defendants. Answer due by 7/30/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/1/2019. (EPD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Plaintiff AKF Inc. & Defendants RSFF LLC, 12 Stone Contracting Group Inc. New date requested 7/30/2019.(Kaminski, Shanna) Modified on & filing parties 7/1/2019 (kk2).
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed: RSFF, LLC served on 6/12/2019, answer due 7/3/2019.SEE DOCKET #13 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event, "Summons Returned Executed," which can be found in the "Service of Process" section of CM/ECF. Failure to properly use this event results in the answer due date not being set. (kk2)
June 13, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed: 12 Stone Contracting Group, Inc. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019SEE DOCKET #12 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to utilize the correct filing event, "Summons Returned Executed," which can be found in the "Service of Process" section of CM/ECF. Failure to properly use this event results in the answer due date not being set. (kk2)
June 13, 2019 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff AKF Inc re #6 Summons Issued (Miglio, Terrence) Modified on 6/14/2019 - see 6/13/2019 corrective entry(kk2)
June 13, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff AKF Inc re #5 Summons Issued (Miglio, Terrence) Modified on 6/14/2019 - see 6/13/2019 corrective entry (kk2).
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Shanna M Kaminski by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 6/5/2019 (kk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6951759) of Shanna M. Kaminski by Plaintiff AKF Inc. (Miglio, Terrence)
May 29, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff AKF Inc (Miglio, Terrence) Modified on 5/30/2019 to clarify text (kk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 8 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Lauren G Raines (kk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 7 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Shanna M Kaminski (kk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to RSFF, LLC (kk)
May 29, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to 12 Stone Contracting Group, Inc. (kk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff AKF Inc (Miglio, Terrence) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct text (kk)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons to RSFF, LLC (Miglio, Terrence)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons to 12 Stone Contracting Group, Inc. (Miglio, Terrence)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against 12 Stone Contracting Group, Inc., and RSFF, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6939289), filed by AKF Inc (Miglio, Terrence) Modified on 5/29/2019 to correct party names (kk)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AKF Inc v. 12 Stone Contracting Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSFF, LLC, d/b/a 12 STONE NORTH
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 12 STONE CONTRACTING GROUP, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSFF, LLC
Represented By: James David Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKF INC., d/b/a FUNDKITE
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKF Inc
Represented By: Terrence J Miglio
Represented By: Shanna M Kaminski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?