McGlone et al v. Centrus Energy Corp. et al
Plaintiff: K. D., Julia Dunham, Ursula McGlone, C. D. and Jason McGlone
Defendant: Mid-America Conversion Services, Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC, Bechtel Jacobs Company, LLC, United States Enrichment Corporation, BWXT Conversion Services, LLC, Uranium Disposition Services, LLC, LATA/Parallax Portsmouth, LLC and Centrus Energy Corp.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02196
Filed: May 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Torts to Land
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER granting #4 & #5 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David R. Barney, Jr and Kevin W. Thompson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 7/1/2019. (er)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone re #11 Notice (Other) Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia - Certificate of Good Standing of David R. Barney, Jr. (Scott, Stuart)
June 27, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone re #10 Notice (Other) Supreme Court of Appeals of West Virginia - Certificate of Good Standing of Kevin W. Thompson (Scott, Stuart)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTATION ORDER: granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Victor T. Cobb. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 21, 2019. (jlk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTATION ORDER: granting #8 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stephen H. Wussow. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 21, 2019. (jlk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER: granting #7 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Celeste Brustowicz. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 21, 2019. (jlk)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTATION ORDER: granting #6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Stuart H. Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 21, 2019. (jlk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: re #5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6970220) of David R. Barney, Jr. Deficiency Deadline: 7/3/2019. (jlk)
June 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to Motions #4 and #5 , Deficiency Deadline by 7/3/2019. (jlk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6970209) of Kevin W. Thompson. Deficiency Deadline: 7/3/2019. (jlk)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6974320) of Victor T. Cobb by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Victor T. Cobb) (Scott, Stuart)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6974219) of Stephen H. Wussow by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Stephen H. Wussow) (Scott, Stuart)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6974008) of Celeste Brustowicz by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Celeste Brustowicz) (Scott, Stuart)
June 19, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6973965) of Stuart H. Smith by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Stuart H. Smith) (Scott, Stuart)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6970220) of David R. Barney, Jr. by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of David R. Barney) (Scott, Stuart)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6970209) of Kevin W. Thompson by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Kevin W. Thompson) (Scott, Stuart)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Mark F. Underwood. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 10, 2019. (jlk)
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6958658) of Mark F. Underwood by Plaintiffs C. D., K. D., Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, Ursula McGlone. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing of Mark F. Underwood) (Scott, Stuart)
May 26, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Class Action against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6939975), filed by Julia Dunham, Jason McGlone, K. D., Ursula McGlone, C. D.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Scott, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: McGlone et al v. Centrus Energy Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mid-America Conversion Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fluor-BWXT Portsmouth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bechtel Jacobs Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Enrichment Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BWXT Conversion Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uranium Disposition Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LATA/Parallax Portsmouth, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centrus Energy Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: K. D.
Represented By: Stuart E Scott
Represented By: Victor Cobb
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: Mark F. Underwood
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Jason Andrew Leasure
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart H. Smith
Represented By: Stephen H. Wussow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julia Dunham
Represented By: Stuart E Scott
Represented By: Victor Cobb
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: Mark F. Underwood
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Jason Andrew Leasure
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart H. Smith
Represented By: Stephen H. Wussow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ursula McGlone
Represented By: Stuart E Scott
Represented By: Victor Cobb
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: Mark F. Underwood
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Jason Andrew Leasure
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart H. Smith
Represented By: Stephen H. Wussow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: C. D.
Represented By: Stuart E Scott
Represented By: Victor Cobb
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: Mark F. Underwood
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Jason Andrew Leasure
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart H. Smith
Represented By: Stephen H. Wussow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason McGlone
Represented By: Stuart E Scott
Represented By: Victor Cobb
Represented By: Kevin W. Thompson
Represented By: Mark F. Underwood
Represented By: Kevin C. Hulick
Represented By: Jason Andrew Leasure
Represented By: Celeste Brustowicz
Represented By: David R. Barney, Jr.
Represented By: Stuart H. Smith
Represented By: Stephen H. Wussow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?