Rotondo v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Plaintiff: Derek Rotondo
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02328
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000e
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTATION ORDER granting #18 Motion for Extension of Time to Mail Court-Approved Notice and Claim Form. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/2/2019. (agm)
July 1, 2019 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 7/12/2019. Joint Motion for Extension of Time to Mail Court-Approved Notice and Claim Form by Plaintiff Derek Rotondo. (Levenson, Freda)
June 27, 2019 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. on 6/11/2019, answer due 8/12/2019. (Levenson, Freda)
June 21, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Fairness Hearing set for 10/30/2019 02:00 PM in Courtroom 4 - Columbus before Judge George C. Smith. (mdr)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting #2 Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Conditional Certification of the Settlement Class, Appointment of Plaintiff's Counsel as Class Counsel, and Approval of the Proposed Notice of Settlement and Class Action Settlement Procedure. Fairness hearing set for OCTOBER 30, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 4. Signed by Judge George C. Smith on 06/20/2019. (mdr)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTATION ORDER granting #12 , #13 , & #14 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Thomas J Perrelli, Samuel C Birnbaum, & Emily M Loeb by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/11/2019 (kk)
June 10, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6959233) of Emily M. Loeb by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Terrell, Alyson)
June 10, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6959221) of Samuel C. Birnbaum by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Terrell, Alyson)
June 10, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6959166) of Thomas J. Perrelli by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Terrell, Alyson) Modified on 6/11/2019 to correct atty name (kk)
June 4, 2019 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey S Dunlap for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.SEE DOCKET #10 FOR DOCUMENT (kk)
June 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 , #4 , #5 , & #6 Motions for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Galen Sherwin, Peter Romer-Friedman, Deirdre Aaron, and Pooja Shethji by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 6/4/2019. (kk)
June 4, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Alyson A Terrell for Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. (Terrell, Alyson)
June 3, 2019 Case transferred in from Western Division at Cincinnati Division on 06/03/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-408. Case assigned to Judge George C. Smith and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (eh)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER - This case is hereby TRANSFERRED from the docket of The Honorable Susan J. Dlott to the Clerk of this Court for reassignment in the Eastern Division in Colwnbus. Signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/3/2019. (eh)
June 3, 2019 Notice of Correction: Please disregard [FORMER DOC. 8] - filed using incorrect ECF event in error. (eh)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 [FORMER DOC. 8 - PLEASE DISREGARD. FILED IN ERROR]. ORDER REASSIGNING CASE signed by Judge Susan J. Dlott on 6/3/2019. Case reassigned to Judge William O. Bertelsman for all further proceedings. Judge Susan J. Dlott no longer assigned to case. (eh) Modified docket text and document security on 6/3/2019 (eh).
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER transferring the case from the docket of the Hon. Michael R. Barrett to the Clerks Office for reassignment. Case reassigned to Judge Susan J. Dlott for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/31/19. (sct)
May 31, 2019 If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (eh)
May 30, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6944755) of Pooja Shethji by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6944722) of Deirdre Aaron by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6944705) of Peter Romer-Friedman by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-6944640) of Galen Sherwin by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Levenson, Freda)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 Unopposed MOTION for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement, Conditional Certification of the Settlement Class, Appointment of Plaintiff's Counsel as Class Counsel, and Approval of the Proposed Notice of Settlement and Class Action Settlement Procedure and Memorandum in Support by Plaintiff Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Romer-Friedman Declaration with Exhibits, #2 Exhibit Sherwin Declaration, #3 Exhibit Wickersham Declaration with Exhibits) (Levenson, Freda). Added MOTION to Certify Class, MOTION to Appoint Counsel, MOTION for Settlement on 5/31/2019 (eh).
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6944481), filed by Rotondo Derek. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Levenson, Freda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rotondo v. JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek Rotondo
Represented By: Freda J Levenson
Represented By: Galen Sherwin
Represented By: Pooja Shethji
Represented By: Peter Romer-Friedman
Represented By: Deirdre Aaron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank N.A.
Represented By: Alyson A Terrell
Represented By: Jeffrey S Dunlap
Represented By: Samuel C Birnbaum
Represented By: Emily M Loeb
Represented By: Thomas J Perrelli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?