Moats v. Holzer Clinic et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Moats, Sr.
Defendant: Dr. Valtine, Holzer Clinic, Mary Brown, Rina Garber, Ryan Finch, Andrew Shea and Dr. Scott
Case Number: 2:2019cv02361
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 2, 2019 Filing 24 Letter from Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER - The Clerk is DIRECTED to SEAL #22 Notice filed by Kenneth Moats, Sr. Plaintiff is ORDERED to cease filing such documents and ADVISED that if he needs to communicate with the Court he must do so by way of formal motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 2, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 1, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew) Modified security on 8/2/2019 (jlk).
July 29, 2019 Filing 21 Letter from Kenneth Moats Sr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 19 BRIEF re #18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Andrew Shea. (Guevara, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Andrew Shea. (Guevara, Gregory)
July 15, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Gregory W Guevara for Defendant Andrew Shea (Guevara, Gregory)
July 11, 2019 Filing 16 ANSWER to #5 Amended Complaint, filed by Mary Brown, Ryan Finch, Rina Garber, Holzer Clinic, Dr. Scott, Dr. Valtine. (Brudny, James)
July 2, 2019 Filing 15 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE: Materials returned to Plaintiff by certified mail re #14 received on 7/1/2019. (ew)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - The Court is unable to discern the relevance of these materials at this juncture of this case. Accordingly, the Clerk is DIRECTED to return the materials to Plaintiff by certified mail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 27, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 27, 2019 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Andrew Shea served on 6/24/2019, answer due 7/15/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (kk2)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Mary Brown, Ryan Finch, Dr. Scott, and Dr. Valtine served on 6/20/2019, answers due 7/11/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return Brown, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return Valtine, #3 Certified Mail Receipt Return Scott, #4 Certified Mail Receipt Return Finch) (kk2)
June 24, 2019 Filing 11 Letter from Kenneth Moats Sr (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: The second amended complaint and issued summons were sent via certified mail to Mary Brown, Dr. Valtine, Dr. Scott, Ryan Finch, and Andrew Shea. (ew)
June 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Rina Garber Summons) (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 18, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Holzer Clinic, Mary Brown, Dr. Valtine, Dr. Scott, Ryan Finch, and Andrew Shea. (ew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Holzer Clinic, Mary Brown, Rina Garber, Dr. Valtine, Dr. Scott, Ryan Finch, and Andrew Shea filed by Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Envelope) (ew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 6/18/2019: #3 Exhibits) (ew).
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Holzer Clinic and Mary Brown filed by Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Envelope) (ew)
June 10, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Complaint Deficiency Deadline by 7/10/2019. (jlk)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - Plaintiff is ORDERED to provide a basis for jurisdiction, a statement of the claim, and a request for relief within THIRTY (30) DAYS of the date of this Order re #1 Complaint filed by Kenneth Moats, Sr. Complaint Deficiency Deadline by 7/10/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 10, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Holzer Clinic, Mary Brown, Rina Garber, Dr. Valtine, Dr. Scott, Ryan Finch, and Andrew Shea filed by Kenneth Moats, Sr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits) (ew)
June 5, 2019 Filing fee received: $400. Receipt number: 200COL057294. (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moats v. Holzer Clinic et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Valtine
Represented By: James Joseph Brudny, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Holzer Clinic
Represented By: James Joseph Brudny, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mary Brown
Represented By: James Joseph Brudny, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rina Garber
Represented By: James Joseph Brudny, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ryan Finch
Represented By: James Joseph Brudny, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Shea
Represented By: Gregory W Guevara
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scott
Represented By: James Joseph Brudny, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Moats, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?