Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., Nat'l Assoc. v. Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership, et al.
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co. Nat'l Assoc, as Trustee for Registered Holders of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp. Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 1998- and Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., Nat'l Assoc.
Defendant: Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership, EMSI, INC. dba ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC., MIKE BROWN, Franklin County Treasurer, TORCO TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC, Torco Termite and Pest Control, LLC, EMSI, Inc. and City of Columbus Ohio
Case Number: 2:2019cv02495
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership answer due 8/30/2019. (er)
July 29, 2019 Filing 15 STIPULATION for enlargement of time to move or plead by Defendant Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership. (Wittenberg, Eric)
July 26, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint,, filed by EMSI, Inc.. (Ryan, Daniel)
July 15, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Order Appointing Receiver by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., Nat'l Assoc.. (Mattes, William)
June 28, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Mike Brown, City of Columbus Ohio, EMSI, Inc., Franklin County Treasurer, Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership, Torco Termite and Pest Control, LLC. (jlk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT re #8 Amended Complaint,, Supplemental Affidavit of Joyce Figueroa by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., Nat'l Assoc.. (Mattes, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Appoint Receiver by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., Nat'l Assoc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C) (Mattes, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to the City of Columbus, Ohio (Mattes, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mike Brown, EMSI, Inc., Franklin County Treasurer, Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership, Torco Termite and Pest Control, LLC, City of Columbus Ohio, filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., Nat'l Assoc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K) (Mattes, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Mike Brown (Mattes, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Torco Termite and Pest Control, LLC (Mattes, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to EMSI, Inc. d/b/a Environmental Management Services, Inc. (Mattes, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Franklin County Treasurer (Mattes, William)
June 26, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. to Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership (Mattes, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co. Nat'l Assoc, as Trustee for Registered Holders of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp. Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 1998-. (Mattes, William)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR FORECLOSURE against EMSI, INC. dba ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC., Franklin County Treasurer, Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership, MIKE BROWN, TORCO TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6968173), filed by Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co. Nat'l Assoc, as Trustee for Registered Holders of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp. Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 1998-. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit) (Mattes, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., Nat'l Assoc. v. Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Graoch Associates #50 Limited Partnership
Represented By: Eric Jay Wittenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMSI, INC. dba ENVIRONMENTAL MANAGEMENT SERVICES INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MIKE BROWN
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Franklin County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TORCO TERMITE AND PEST CONTROL LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Torco Termite and Pest Control, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EMSI, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Francis Ryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Columbus Ohio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co. Nat'l Assoc, as Trustee for Registered Holders of Credit Suisse First Boston Mortgage Securities Corp. Commercial Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates Series 1998-
Represented By: William M Mattes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bank of New York Mellon Trust Co., Nat'l Assoc.
Represented By: William M Mattes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?