Thornton v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Estate of Stephen Riley Thornton
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02532
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Memorandum in Support, #3 Exhibit A -- Applicable Policy) (Downey, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company answer due 7/16/2019. (jlk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION for Extension of Time by Defendant Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Downey, Brian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, filed by Estate of Stephen Riley Thornton. (jlk)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company, Hartford Life, Inc., Hartford Holdings, Inc., Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Hartford Life, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Hartford Financial Services Group, Inc. for Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company.. (Downey, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Meigs County Probate Court, case number 20181087 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6971630), filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A -- Complaint filed in Meigs County Probate Court, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Downey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thornton v. Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Stephen Riley Thornton
Represented By: Michael Lewis Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian P Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?