Lawson v. Commissioner of Social Security

Plaintiff: Lori Lawson
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA and Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv02584
Filed: June 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 16, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security c/o the U.S Attorney's Office (Columbus, OH). (daf)
July 12, 2019 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. The Attorney General of the United States (Washington, DC) was served on 7/9/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (daf)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. The Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region V Social Security Administration was served on 7/8/2019, answer due 9/6/2019. (daf)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A copy of the Complaint and Summons Form had been mailed via certified mail to the Office of the Regional Chief Counsel, Region V Social Security Administration, U.S. Attorney, and Attorney General of the United States U.S. Department of Justice. (daf)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to the U.S. Attorney General. (daf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Acciani, Henry)
June 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons (daf)
June 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security and the U.S. Attorney's Office (daf)
June 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER - re #1 Complaint, filed by Lori Lawson. The Commissioner shall file and serve a certified copy of the administrative record within 60 days after service of the summons and Complaint, which copy shall function as the Answer. Plaintiff must file a Statement of Errors within 45 days after filing of the administrative record setting forth the bases upon which reversal or remand is sought. The Commissioner must file and serve a Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiffs Statement of Errors within 45 days after service of the Statement of Errors. Plaintiffs Reply, if any, must be filed 15 days later. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on June 21, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (jlk)
June 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of SSA ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6975982), filed by Lori Lawson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Regional Chief Counsel, #3 Summons Form U.S. Attorney, #4 Summons Form Attorney General) (Acciani, Henry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lawson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of SSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Lawson
Represented By: Henry Domenick Acciani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?