Carty v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Plaintiff: Pat Carty
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv02650
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. identifying Corporate Parents G4S Holding One, Inc.; G4S USA Holdings Limited; G4S Corporate Services Limited; and G4S plc. (Chermely, Abby) Modified text on 8/16/2019 (ew).
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss or Transfer Venue Under Rule 12(B)(3) by Defendant G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. (Attachments: #1 of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B) (Chermely, Abby)
August 12, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pat Carty Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Consent of Timothy Wroda) (Moyle, Jeffrey)
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pat Carty Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Consent of Brighan Madriz) (Moyle, Jeffrey)
August 2, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE by Plaintiff Pat Carty Of Filing Consent Form To Join In Collective Action Under 29 U.S.C. 216(b) (Attachments: #1 Consent of Brock Smith, #2 Consent of Demetres Williams) (Moyle, Jeffrey)
August 1, 2019 Filing 7 AMENDED COMPLAINT against G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc., filed by Pat Carty. (Moyle, Jeffrey)
July 18, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Answer due 8/12/2019. (ew)
July 18, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Defendant G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.'s Time to Move, Answer, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Defendant G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.. (Chermely, Abby)
July 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Abby E. Chermely for Defendant G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. (Chermely, Abby)
July 3, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. Served on 7/1/2019. Answer due 7/22/2019. (ew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: Summons & complaint sent by certified mail to G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. (kk2)
June 24, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. (kk2)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6978570), filed by Pat Carty. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Exhibit A- Consent of Pat Carty) (Moyle, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Carty v. G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pat Carty
Represented By: Jeffrey Joseph Moyle
Represented By: Shannon Marie Draher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: G4S Secure Solutions (USA) Inc.
Represented By: Abby E. Chermely
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?