Wilson v. Barr et al
Petitioner: Koko Wleh Wilson
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello, Jeffrey D Lynch, Johnny Choate, William P Barr and Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Case Number: 2:2019cv02666
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 ***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of Colorado as case 1:19-cv-02069, filed 07/17/2019. (er)
July 17, 2019 Case transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Case file and docket sheet sent electronically. (ew)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER denying as moot #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and transferring case to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/17/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 16, 2019 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number 200COL057823 (jlk) Modified text on 7/16/2019 (daf).
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Petitioner Koko Wleh Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (daf)
June 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deficiency Deadline (daf)
June 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY (Attachments: #1 Application and Affidavit by Incarcerated Person to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees) (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Koko Wleh Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Envelope, #2 Envelope) (daf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilson v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ronald Vitiello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jeffrey D Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Johnny Choate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen M. Nielsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Koko Wleh Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?