Zelenitz v. Golden Rule Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Gregory Zelenitz
Defendant: Golden Rule Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv02786
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE by Plaintiff Gregory Zelenitz of Service of Plaintiff's First Interrogatories and Requests for Production to Defendant (Blass, Scott)
August 16, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Gregory Zelenitz PLAINTIFF'S INITIAL RULE 26(a)(1) DISCLOSURES (Blass, Scott)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR THE PRODUCTION AND EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 9, 2019. (jlk)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR THE PRODUCTION AND EXCHANGE OF CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION by Defendant Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Erica Cross Conti. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 9, 2019. (jlk)
August 8, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7053555) of Erica Cross Conti by Plaintiff Gregory Zelenitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Blass, Scott)
August 2, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 8/9/2019. (jlk)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Protective Order. The parties will have until August 9, 2019 to submit their proposed Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 2, 2019. (jlk)
August 2, 2019 Filing 10 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File New date requested 8/9/2019. JOINT MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINE TO SUBMIT PROTECTIVE ORDER by Plaintiff Gregory Zelenitz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Blass, Scott)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 11/1/2019. Motions to Amend due by 11/1/2019. Initial Disclosures due by 8/16/2019. Discovery due by 6/1/2020. Clawback Agreement Deadline due by 8/2/2019. Dispositive motions due by 7/1/2020. Primary Expert due by 3/2/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 4/1/2020. Settlement Demand due by 5/1/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 5/15/2020. Mediation Deadline: 6/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on July 30, 2019. (jlk)
July 23, 2019 NOTICE : The PPTC set for 7/30/2019 at 10:30 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No. #8 .) (sln)
July 23, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
July 16, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 200COL057837 (daf)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendants Golden Rule Insurance Company, UnitedHealth Group, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent UnitedHealth Group, Inc. for Golden Rule Insurance Company.. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 Civil Cover Sheet attachment to Golden Rule Insurance Company's ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
July 3, 2019 Filing 5 Defendant Golden Rule Insurance Company's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Lloyd, Katheryn)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT filed on May 24,2019 in the Court of Common Pleas of Belmont County, Ohio by Gregory Zelenitz against Golden Rule Insurance Company. (mdr)
July 1, 2019 Filing 2 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Erica C. Conti (mdr)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Belmont County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19 CV 0216, filed by Golden Rule Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A-Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Ex. B-Copies of Pleadings, Process, Orders, and All Other Papers) (Lloyd, Katheryn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zelenitz v. Golden Rule Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Zelenitz
Represented By: Erica C. Conti
Represented By: Scott Steven Blass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Rule Insurance Company
Represented By: Katheryn M Lloyd
Represented By: Meagan Roeth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?