Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Matt Winters Excavating, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Defendant: Matt Winters Excavation, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC, Matt Winters Excavating, LLC and Matt Winters Excavation
Case Number: 2:2019cv02841
Filed: July 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Ball, Steven)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting #8 Plt's Motion to Accelerate and Compel Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 8/22/2019. (sln)
August 21, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel by Plaintiff Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Ball, Steven)
August 20, 2019 Filing 7 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Matt Winters Excavating, LLC. (er)
August 18, 2019 Filing 6 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Matt Winters Excavating, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC . (Ball, Steven)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Plaintiff is ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE why the claims against Defendant should not be dismissed for want of prosecution WITHIN 14 DAYS of the date of this Order unless it has applied for an entry of default from the Clerk in the interim. Show Cause Deadline is 8/26/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 12, 2019. (jlk)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Matt Winters Excavating, LLC served on 7/15/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. (er)
July 10, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Matt Winters Excavating, LLC. (sem)
July 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Matt Winters Excavation, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-6992253), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Ball, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Matt Winters Excavating, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Represented By: Steven Louis Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Winters Excavation, LLC aka Matt Winters Excavation, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Winters Excavating, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matt Winters Excavation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?