Wallace v. Fine Home Furnishings, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rick Wallace
Defendant: Fine Home Furnishings, LLC, Furniture Empire, LLC, B & A Holdings of America, LLC and A.J. Hussein
Case Number: 2:2019cv02973
Filed: July 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Conditional Certification and Approving Notice and Consent. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 9/6/2019. (cmw)
September 5, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION to Certify Class Conditionally Pursuant to 29 U.S.C. 216(b) by Plaintiff Rick Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Notice and Consent to Join) (Coffman, Matthew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by All Defendants. (McNinch, Deborah)
August 19, 2019 ***Answer due by all defendants: 09/09/2019. (er)
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to All Defendants. (Coffman, Matthew)
July 26, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Rick Wallace of filing Consent to Join (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Zag Consent) (Coffman, Matthew)
July 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7003063), filed by Rick Wallace. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Wallace Consent, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Coffman, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Fine Home Furnishings, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fine Home Furnishings, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Karn
Represented By: Deborah L McNinch
Represented By: S. Kyle Dodderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Furniture Empire, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Karn
Represented By: Deborah L McNinch
Represented By: S. Kyle Dodderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B & A Holdings of America, LLC
Represented By: Courtney Karn
Represented By: Deborah L McNinch
Represented By: S. Kyle Dodderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.J. Hussein
Represented By: Courtney Karn
Represented By: Deborah L McNinch
Represented By: S. Kyle Dodderer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick Wallace
Represented By: Matthew James Porter Coffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?