Fountain v. Firefly Agency LLC et al
Plaintiff: Norman L. Fountain
Defendant: Fritz Griffioen, James R. Carnes, Esq., Rodney Mayhill, William Griffioen and Firefly Agency LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv03004
Filed: July 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 10/1/2019 10:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants may have until SEPTEMBER 13, 2019, in which to respond to the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 16, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 9/13/2019. by Defendants James R. Carnes, Esq, Firefly Agency LLC, Fritz Griffioen, William Griffioen, Rodney Mayhill. (Kemp, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants James R. Carnes, Esq, Firefly Agency LLC, Fritz Griffioen, William Griffioen, Rodney Mayhill. Fritz Griffioen served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; William Griffioen served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019; Rodney Mayhill served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form, #4 Summons Form) (jlk)
July 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to James R. Carnes Esq, Firefly Agency LLC, Fritz Griffioen, William Griffioen, and Rodney Mayhill (kk2)
July 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against James R. Carnes Esq, Firefly Agency LLC, Fritz Griffioen, William Griffioen, and Rodney Mayhill filed by Norman L. Fountain (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M) (kk2)
July 11, 2019 Filing fee received: $400. Receipt number: 200COL057768. (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fountain v. Firefly Agency LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fritz Griffioen
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James R. Carnes, Esq.
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rodney Mayhill
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Griffioen
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Firefly Agency LLC
Represented By: Matthew T. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Norman L. Fountain
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?