Motes, as Administrator of Estate of Shannon Lee Sparks v. Wilson et al
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Motes, as Administrator of Estate of Shannon Lee Sparks
Defendant: Alazar Hailemichael, Josi Trucking, LLC, John Doe 1-10 and Willie R. Wilson
Case Number: 2:2019cv03057
Filed: July 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2020. Motions to Amend due by 10/1/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 10/1/2019. Discovery due by 5/1/2020. Dispositive motions due by 6/1/2020. Responses due by 6/22/2020 Replies due by 7/6/2020. Primary Expert due by 1/31/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 3/13/2020. Settlement Demand due by 7/6/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 7/20/2020. Mediation Deadline: 8/1/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 21, 2019. (jlk) (This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
August 13, 2019 NOTICE : The PPTC set for 8/20/2019 at 11:00 AM is VACATED. (See ECF No. #8 .) (sln)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendants Alazar Hailemichael, Josi Trucking, LLC, Willie R. Wilson. (Lashuk, Beth Anne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL PROOF OF RENDERING NOTICE OF REMOVAL TO STATE COURT from Pike County Court of Common Pleas, case number 2019CIV000176 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7021342), filed by Alazar Hailemichael, Josi Trucking, LLC, Willie R. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Rendering Notice to State Court) (Lashuk, Beth Anne)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/20/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
July 16, 2019 Filing 5 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Mark D. Tolles, II, Esq. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 4 Notice by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio of Pro Hac Vice Rules as to Attorney Michael L. Benson, Esq. (mdr)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER Filed on 7/12/19 in Pike County Court of Common Pleas as Case No. 2019CIV000176 to #2 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Alazar Hailemichael, Josi Trucking, LLC, Willie R. Wilson. (mdr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND Filed on 6/26/19 in Pike County Court of Common Pleas as Case No. 2019CIV000176 against Alazar Hailemichael, Josi Trucking, LLC and Willie R. Wilson filed by Alazar Hailemichael, Josi Trucking, LLC, Willie R. Wilson. (mdr)
July 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas of Pike County, Ohio, case number 2019CIV000176 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7010400), filed by Alazar Hailemichael, Josi Trucking, LLC, Willie R. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint, #2 Exhibit Defendants' Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint, #3 Supplement Corporate Disclosure Statement of Defendant Josi Trucking, LLC, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet) (Lashuk, Beth Anne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Motes, as Administrator of Estate of Shannon Lee Sparks v. Wilson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph E. Motes, as Administrator of Estate of Shannon Lee Sparks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alazar Hailemichael
Represented By: Beth Anne S Lashuk
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca
Represented By: Sean P Casey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josi Trucking, LLC
Represented By: Beth Anne S Lashuk
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca,
Represented By: Sean P Casey,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Willie R. Wilson
Represented By: Beth Anne S Lashuk
Represented By: Jeffrey John Jurca,
Represented By: Sean P Casey,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?