Upcharch v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Gayle Upcharch
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv03081
Filed: July 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/5/2019, answer due 10/4/2019. (mdr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/1/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. (mdr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Judy C. Tsui for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Tsui, Judy)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, c/o U.S. Attorney of the Southern District of Ohio, 303 Marconi Blvd., Suite 200, Columbus, Ohio 43215. (mdr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, c/o Attorney General of the United States, 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW, Room 5111, Washington, DC 20530-0001 (mdr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, c/o Office of the Regional Chief of Counsel, Region V, Social Security Administration, 200 W. Adams Street, 30th Floor, Chicago, IL 60606 (mdr)
July 18, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security filed by Gayle Upcharch. (ew) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/22/2019: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons 1, #3 USM Form 285 (1), #4 Summons 2, #5 Form 285(2), #6 Summons 3, #7 Form 285(3)) (mdr).
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to return the Civil Cover Sheet, Summons, and US Marshal Form 285 to the Clerk's Office. Upon receipt, the United States Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process by certified mail. The Commissioner's certified copy of the Administrative Record, which shall serve as the answer, due within sixty (60) days after service. Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Commissioner's response due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, parties should file their consents within thirty (30) days after service of the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 7/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge) (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Civil Cover Sheet, Summons and USM Form 285) by Plaintiff Gayle Upcharch. (Attachments: #1 Complaint) (mdr) Modified docket text to correct all missing documents on 7/18/2019 (mdr).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Upcharch v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Judy C. Tsui
Represented By: John J. Stark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gayle Upcharch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?