Project Veritas et al v. Ohio Elections Commission
Plaintiff: Project Veritas Action Fund, James O'Keefe and project veritas
Defendant: Ohio Elections Commission, Dennis Brommer, D. Michael Crites, Degree Wilhelm, Scott Norman, Otto Beatty, III and Catherine Cunningham
Case Number: 2:2019cv03130
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Filing 25 ANSWER to #4 Amended Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Carwile, Tiffany)
September 6, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE by Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas re #23 Reply to Response to Motion (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Russell Verney) (Thompson, Maurice)
September 5, 2019 Filing 23 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas, Project Veritas Action Fund. (Thompson, Maurice)
September 3, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument RESET for 10/1/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. Plaintiff's reply brief is due September 5, 2019. (cmw)
August 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument RESET for 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
August 21, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Julie M Pfeiffer for Defendants Otto Beatty, III, Dennis Brommer, D. Michael Crites, Catherine Cunningham, Scott Norman, Degree Wilhelm (Pfeiffer, Julie)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying as moot #15 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 8/21/2019. (cmw)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas, Project Veritas Action Fund (Thompson, Maurice)
August 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas, Project Veritas Action Fund (Thompson, Maurice)
August 19, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas, Project Veritas Action Fund of Joint Stipulation on Waiver of Service (Thompson, Maurice)
August 19, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction by Defendants Otto Beatty, III, Dennis Brommer, D. Michael Crites, Catherine Cunningham, Scott Norman, Ohio Elections Commission, Degree Wilhelm. (Carwile, Tiffany)
August 19, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Defendants Otto Beatty, III, Dennis Brommer, D. Michael Crites, Catherine Cunningham, Scott Norman, Ohio Elections Commission, Degree Wilhelm. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Richter Declaration) (Carwile, Tiffany)
July 29, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Oral Argument set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 2 - Columbus before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER - Defendant's response is due on or before 8/19/2019, Plaintiff's Reply is due on or before 9/3/2019, Oral Argument 9/13/2019 at 10:00 a.m. Signed by Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus on 7/29/2019. (cmw)
July 29, 2019 Filing 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus: Telephone Status Conference held on 7/26/2019. (Court Reporter: Darla Coulter) (cmw)
July 25, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Benjamin T Barr for Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas, Project Veritas Action Fund (Barr, Benjamin)
July 25, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Brandi R. Laser Seskes for Defendants Otto Beatty, III, Dennis Brommer, D. Michael Crites, Catherine Cunningham, Scott Norman, Ohio Elections Commission, Degree Wilhelm (Laser Seskes, Brandi)
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTATION ORDER: The Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Benjamin T. Barr is GRANTED . By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/25/2019. (daf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 200COL057928) of Benjamin Barr by Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas, and Project Veritas Action Fund. (daf)
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L. Carwile for Defendants Otto Beatty, III, Dennis Brommer, D. Michael Crites, Catherine Cunningham, Scott Norman, Ohio Elections Commission, Degree Wilhelm (Carwile, Tiffany)
July 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephone Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 09:30 AM via Teleconference before Chief Judge Edmund A. Sargus. (cmw)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas, Project Veritas Action Fund. (Thompson, Maurice)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Project Veritas, James O'Keefe, Project Veritas Action Fund. (Thompson, Maurice)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 7/22/2019. (agm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to File Motion Exceeding Page Limitation by Plaintiffs James O'Keefe, Project Veritas Action Fund, project veritas. (Thompson, Maurice)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7018352), filed by project veritas, James O'Keefe, Project Veritas Action Fund. [ELECTION ISSUE(S) CITED] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through E to Verified Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Thompson, Maurice)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Project Veritas et al v. Ohio Elections Commission
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Project Veritas Action Fund
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Represented By: Curt Carl Hartman
Represented By: Benjamin T Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Keefe
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Represented By: Curt Carl Hartman
Represented By: Benjamin T Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: project veritas
Represented By: Maurice A Thompson
Represented By: Curt Carl Hartman
Represented By: Benjamin T Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ohio Elections Commission
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Brandi R. Laser Seskes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dennis Brommer
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Julie M Pfeiffer
Represented By: Brandi R. Laser Seskes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Michael Crites
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Julie M Pfeiffer
Represented By: Brandi R. Laser Seskes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Degree Wilhelm
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Julie M Pfeiffer
Represented By: Brandi R. Laser Seskes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Norman
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Julie M Pfeiffer
Represented By: Brandi R. Laser Seskes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Otto Beatty, III
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Julie M Pfeiffer
Represented By: Brandi R. Laser Seskes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Cunningham
Represented By: Tiffany L. Carwile
Represented By: Julie M Pfeiffer
Represented By: Brandi R. Laser Seskes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?