Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. King Tut, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Defendant: George Buczkowski, King Tut, Inc., Merrie Obey, Chatos Obey, Jordan Devante Moore, Sr., Quentin Edwards, Easy Brothers, Inc., James Devon Fife and Rosie O'Grady's
Case Number: 2:2019cv03441
Filed: August 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTATION ORDER construing #25 Stipulation as a Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants Chatos Obey and Merrie Obey shall respond to the Complaint by 11/11/2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/4/2019. (agm)
October 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Merrie Obey answer due 11/11/2019; Chatos Obey answer due 11/11/2019 per #25 Stipulation filed on 10/03/19. (mdr)
October 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Rosie O'Grady's answer due 10/10/2019. (mdr)
October 4, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Easy Brothers, Inc. answer due 10/8/2019; Quentin Edwards answer due 10/8/2019. (mdr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 25 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Plaintiff Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
October 3, 2019 Filing 24 Alias Summons Issued as to George Buczkowski. (mdr)
October 3, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE of Appearance by Tom Somos for Defendants Merrie Obey, Chatos Obey (Somos, Tom)
October 3, 2019 Filing 22 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Alias Summons - George Buczkowski] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Quentin Edwards on 09/17/2019, filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Merrie Obey on 09/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Chatos Obey on 09/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Rosie O'Grady's on 09/19/2019, filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
October 1, 2019 Filing 17 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Easy Brothers, Inc. on 09/17/2019, filed by Plaintiff Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 27, 2019 Filing 16 Alias Summons Issued as to James Devon Fife, Jordan Devante Moore, Sr. (mdr)
September 26, 2019 Filing 15 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Alias Summons] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 26, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Alias Summons] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to George Buczkowski, Easy Brothers, Inc., Quentin Edwards, James Devon Fife, King Tut, Inc., Jordan Devante Moore, Sr, Merrie Obey, Chatos Obey, Rosie O'Grady's. (mdr)
September 12, 2019 Filing 12 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Quentin Edwards] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Rosie O'Grady's] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Merrie Obey] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [King Tut, Inc.] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Jordan Devante Moore, Sr.] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [James Devon Fife] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Easy Brothers, Inc.] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [Chatos Obey] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
September 12, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. [George Buczkowski] (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
August 8, 2019 Case transferred in from Cincinnati Division on 08/08/2019 Case Number 1:19-cv-648. Case assigned to Judge George C. Smith and Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura.. (jlw)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The above captioned case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Columbus (Eastern) Division of the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, for reassignment to a Judge at that location. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 8//2019. (jlw)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company, Scottsdale Insurance Company, Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Nationwide Mutual Insurance Company, Other Affiliate Scottsdale Insurance Company for Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company.. (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)
August 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7052053), filed by Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Policy, #2 Exhibit B - Underlying Complaint, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet) (Fedynyshyn-Conforti, Lisa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company v. King Tut, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George Buczkowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: King Tut, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merrie Obey
Represented By: Tom Somos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chatos Obey
Represented By: Tom Somos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Devante Moore, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quentin Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Easy Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Devon Fife
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rosie O'Grady's
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scottsdale Surplus Lines Insurance Company
Represented By: Lisa M. Fedynyshyn-Conforti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?