Elliott v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Adam M. Elliott
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv03445
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Farrell, Clifford)
September 9, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Adam R. Sorkin for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Sorkin, Adam)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Served on 8/28/2019. Answer due 10/28/2019. (Farrell, Clifford) Modified text on 9/10/2019 (ew).
August 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 8/22/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Farrell, Clifford)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Commissioner's certified copy of the Administrative Record, which shall serve as the answer, due within sixty (60) days after service. Plaintiff's Statement of Errors due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Commissioner's response due forty-five (45) days thereafter. Plaintiff may reply fifteen (15) days thereafter. If all parties consent to disposition of this case by the Magistrate Judge, parties should file their consents within thirty (30) days after service of the Administrative Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 8/9/2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice of Consent Form) (daf)
August 8, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ew)
August 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Plaintiff to complete service) against Commissioner of Social Security ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7054322), filed by Adam M. Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form Attorney General, #3 Summons Form US Attorney, #4 Summons Form Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Adam R. Sorkin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam M. Elliott
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?