Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Noce Enterprises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Defendant: Noce Enterprises, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03451
Filed: August 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by Noce Enterprises, Inc.. (Norwillo, Vincent)
September 4, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Noce Enterprises, Inc. answer due 9/23/2019. Answer deadline reset per #6 Stipulation of Leave to Plead filed on 8/30/19. (mdr)
August 30, 2019 Filing 6 STIPULATION of Leave to Plead by Defendant Noce Enterprises, Inc.. (Norwillo, Vincent)
August 29, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Vincent T Norwillo for Defendant Noce Enterprises, Inc. (Norwillo, Vincent)
August 19, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Noce Enterprises, Inc. served on 8/17/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (er)
August 13, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk: A copy of the complaint and issued summons was sent to the named defendant via certified mail. (er)
August 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Noce Enterprises, Inc.. (sem)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Noce Enterprises, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7054909), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Ball, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Noce Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Represented By: Steven Louis Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noce Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Vincent T Norwillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?