Drerup v. NetJets Aviation, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Shari S. Drerup
Defendant: Jim McQueen and NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03499
Filed: August 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Filing 5 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Jim McQueen on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Knoll, Laren)
August 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to NetJets Aviation, Inc. on 8/13/2019, answer due 10/15/2019. (Knoll, Laren)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTATION ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Gloria Allred and Dolores Y. Leal entered by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 08/15/2019. (mdr)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $400 paid, receipt number 0648-7062837) of Gloria Allred and Dolores Y. Leal by Plaintiff Shari S. Drerup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Certificate of Standing - Allred, #2 Exhibit 2 - Certificate of Standing - Leal) (Knoll, Laren)
August 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Jim McQueen, NetJets Aviation, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7058921), filed by Shari S. Drerup. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Right to Sue, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Knoll, Laren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Drerup v. NetJets Aviation, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shari S. Drerup
Represented By: Laren E Knoll
Represented By: Gloria Allred
Represented By: Dolores Y Leal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim McQueen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NetJets Aviation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?