International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union No. 413 v. The Kroger Co.

Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union No. 413
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Case Number: 2:2019cv03513
Filed: August 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Kroger Co.. (jlk)
August 13, 2019 Case transferred in from Western Division at Cincinnati on 08/13/2019. Case Number 1:19-cv-654. Case assigned to Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (eh)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 8/13/2019. This case is hereby transferred from the docket of the Honorable Michael R. Barrett to the Office of the Clerk for reassignment to the Eastern Division of the Southern District of Ohio at Columbus. (eh)
August 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT TO COMPEL ARBITRATION against The Kroger Co. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7055970), filed by Intl Bro of Teamsters, Chauffeurs, Warehousemen & Helpers. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Exhibit A-C) (Tsao, Clement)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union No. 413 v. The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: International Brotherhood of Teamsters Local Union No. 413
Represented By: Clement Tsao
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?