Northgate Lincoln-Mercury, Inc. v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Northgate Lincoln-Mercury, Inc.
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03552
Filed: August 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Contract: Franchise
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 12, 2019 Intra District Transfer - Case transferred to Western Division at Cincinnati as case number 1:19-cv-769. This case has been closed and all future filings should be made in case number 1:19-cv-769. (jlk)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Motion to Change Venue. This action is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of Ohio, Western Division at Cincinnati. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on September 12, 2019. (jlk)
September 11, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION to Change Venue by Plaintiff Northgate Lincoln-Mercury, Inc.. (Cornett, Curtis)
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Northgate Lincoln-Mercury, Inc.. (Cornett, Curtis)
August 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/17/2019 11:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Defendant Ford Motor Company re #1 Notice of Removal, Civil Coversheet (McNellie, Elizabeth)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by Ford Motor Company. (McNellie, Elizabeth)
August 15, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Ford Motor Company. (Originally filed on 7/17/2019 in Hamilton County, Ohio, Common Pleas Court.) (sln)
August 15, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Hamilton County Common Pleas, case number A 1903385 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7065195), filed by Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Docket, #2 Exhibit B-Summons and Complaint) (McNellie, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Northgate Lincoln-Mercury, Inc. v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Elizabeth A McNellie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northgate Lincoln-Mercury, Inc.
Represented By: Curtis L Cornett
Represented By: Alison M Huenefeld
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?