Osborne v. Pickaway County Ohio et al
Plaintiff: Alicia Osborne
Defendant: Sheriff Robert B. Radcliff, Pickaway County Ohio, PrimaryOne Health, Cpl. McCarrell, Lt. Gabriel Carpenter, John 1-10 Does, Gary Gillen, M.D., Sgt. Evans, Lorinda Reid, BSN, RN and Deputy Bender
Case Number: 2:2019cv03628
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: PrimaryOne Health answer due 11/12/2019. (daf)
October 14, 2019 Filing 9 STIPULATION re Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant PrimaryOne Health. (Enders, Warren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenton H. Steele for Defendant PrimaryOne Health (Steele, Kenton)
October 8, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Warren Michael Enders for Defendant PrimaryOne Health (Enders, Warren)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Angelica Jarmusz for Defendants Deputy Bender, Gabriel Carpenter, Sgt. Evans, Gary Gillen, M.D., Cpl. McCarrell, Pickaway County Ohio, Robert B. Radcliff, Lorinda Reid, BSN, RN (Jarmusz, Angelica)
September 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel T Downey for Defendants Deputy Bender, Gabriel Carpenter, Sgt. Evans, Gary Gillen, M.D., Cpl. McCarrell, Pickaway County Ohio, Robert B. Radcliff, Lorinda Reid, BSN, RN (Downey, Daniel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Green Cards. The Clerk's Office received green cards for the named Defendants, but were not the ones who did service via certified mail. (daf)
August 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Green Cards. The Clerk's Office received green cards for the named Defendants, but were not the ones who did service via certified mail. (daf) Modified text on 8/29/2019 (daf).
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Alicia Osborne re #1 Complaint Affidavit of Merit (Attachments: #1 Affidavit - Affidavit of Merit) (Shroyer, David)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7070763), filed by Alicia Osborne. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Shroyer, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Osborne v. Pickaway County Ohio et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Osborne
Represented By: David I Shroyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Robert B. Radcliff
Represented By: Angelica Jarmusz
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pickaway County Ohio
Represented By: Angelica Jarmusz
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PrimaryOne Health
Represented By: Kenton H. Steele
Represented By: Warren Michael Enders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cpl. McCarrell
Represented By: Angelica Jarmusz
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lt. Gabriel Carpenter
Represented By: Angelica Jarmusz
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John 1-10 Does
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Gillen, M.D.
Represented By: Angelica Jarmusz
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Evans
Represented By: Angelica Jarmusz
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorinda Reid, BSN, RN
Represented By: Angelica Jarmusz
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Bender
Represented By: Angelica Jarmusz
Represented By: Daniel T Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?