Dickinson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Eugene T. Dickinson
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv03670
Filed: August 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel Julis for Defendant Commissioner of Social Security (Julis, Rachel)
September 25, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Commissioner of Social Security c/o US Attorney General served on 9/17/2019, answer due 11/18/2019SEE DOCKET #7 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to add the party agency served, the date of service, and the answer due date. (kk2)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 **SEE 9/25/2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY** - SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Farrell, Clifford) Modified on 9/26/2019 (kk2)
September 23, 2019 SUMMONS Returned Executed: Commissioner of Social Security c/o Office of Regional Chief Counsel served on 9/16/2019, answer due 11/15/2019SEE DOCKET #6 FOR DOCUMENT. This entry is being created to add the party agency served, the date of service, and the answer due date. (kk2) Modified on 9/24/2019 (kk2).
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 **SEE 9/23/2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY** - SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. (Farrell, Clifford) Modified on 9/24/2019 (kk2)
September 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Commissioner of Social Security. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/13/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (Farrell, Clifford)
August 26, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (jlk)
August 23, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Eugene T. Dickinson. (jlk)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER granting #1 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Administrative record due 60 days after service of summons and complaint, statement of errors due 45 days thereafter, memorandum in opposition to plaintiff's statement of errors within 45 days after service of the statement of errors and Plaintiff's reply, if any, must be filed fifteen 15 days later. All briefing must include references to the administrative record. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on August 23, 2019. (Attachments: #1 Notice and Consent) (jlk)
August 22, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (Plaintiff to complete service) by Plaintiff Eugene T. Dickinson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint, #3 Summons Form Attorney General, #4 Summons Form US Attorney, #5 Summons Form Regional Counsel) (Farrell, Clifford)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dickinson v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: John J. Stark
Represented By: Rachel Julis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene T. Dickinson
Represented By: Clifford Michael Farrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?