Hummel et al v. United States et al
Plaintiff: Terry Hummel, Gail Hummel, Terry V. Hummel and Gail F. Hummel
Defendant: Attorney Office United States, Internal Revenue Service and United States
Case Number: 2:2019cv03726
Filed: August 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Referring Judge: Michael H Watson
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2019 Reset Deadlines (ew)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendants Internal Revenue Service and United States. IRS and United States c/o U.S. Attorney (Columbus) served on 9/13/2019. IRS and United States c/o U.S. Attorney General served on 9/17/2019. Answers due 11/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return, #2 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (Van Hummel, Terry) Modified text on 9/24/2019 (ew).
September 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Internal Revenue Service, United States, U.S. Attorney, and U.S. Attorney General. (ew)
September 5, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 Summons Form, #3 Summons Form) (Van Hummel, Terry)
August 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Terry Hummel ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7082415), filed by Terry Hummel. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Van Hummel, Terry)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hummel et al v. United States et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Hummel
Represented By: Terry Van Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry V. Hummel
Represented By: Terry Van Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail F. Hummel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Office United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Internal Revenue Service
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?