Bonasera v. New River Electrical Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas J Bonasera
Defendant: New River Electrical Corporation, W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. and Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Case Number: 2:2019cv03817
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 25, 2019 Filing 15 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint filed by W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D)
October 15, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Request for Oral Argument by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Def.'s Memo in Support of its Motion to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-D to Memo in Support of Mtn to Dismiss and Request for Oral Argument) (Pryatel, Keith)
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTATION ORDER granting #12 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #8 Amended Complaint. W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc. answer due 10/29/2019. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/15/2019. (agm)
October 11, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 10/29/2019. by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The October 9, 2019 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 2/24/2020. Motions to Amend due by 2/24/2020. Initial Disclosures due by 1/7/2020. Discovery (Fact) due by 10/5/2020. Dispositive motions due by 11/19/2020. Primary Expert due by 6/17/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 7/27/2020. Settlement Demand due by 1/7/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/7/2020. Mediation Deadline: 4/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/3/2019. (daf)
October 2, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D)
October 1, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #8 Amended Complaint filed by Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company. (Abshier, Brandon)
October 1, 2019 Filing 8 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Thomas J Bonasera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Smith, Scott)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2019 03:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
September 23, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #3 Complaint with Jury Demand filed by W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D)
September 10, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Its Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-E in Support of its Motion to Dismiss) (Pryatel, Keith)
September 9, 2019 Reset deadlines pursuant to #4 : Answers due 10/2/2019. (ew)
September 9, 2019 Filing 4 STIPULATION Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.. (Kasson, D)
September 5, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against New River Electrical Corporation, Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company, and W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc., filed by Thomas J Bonasera. (daf)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant New River Electrical Corporation. (Hofstetter, John)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19-CV-006347, filed by New River Electrical Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Process, Pleadings and Orders, #2 Exhibit State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal, #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (Pryatel, Keith)
September 4, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7091658 (kk2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bonasera v. New River Electrical Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New River Electrical Corporation
Represented By: Keith L Pryatel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.D. Wright Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pennsylvania National Mutual Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas J Bonasera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?