Shafeay v. USCIS Columbus Field Office Director et al
Plaintiff: Salwan A. Shafeay
Defendant: Attorney General Attorney General Of The United States, USCIS, Director, USCIS Columbus Field Office Director and Acting Director Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 2:2019cv04025
Filed: September 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: George C Smith
Nature of Suit: Naturalization Application
Cause of Action: 8:1446
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 22, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Attorney General Of The United States. Attorney General Of The United States served on 10/15/2019, answer due 11/5/2019. (mdr)
October 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant USCIS Columbus Field Office Director. USCIS Columbus Field Office Director served on 10/9/2019, answer due 10/30/2019. (mdr)
October 8, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk of the Summons and Complaint via Certified Mail on Defendant William H. Barr, Attorney General, 9500 Pennsylvania Ave., NW, Washington DC 20530 (Article No. 7011 2000 0000 9007 7226), U.S. Attorney, Civil Process Clerk, 303 Marconi Blvd., Ste 200, Columbus, Ohio 43215 (Article No. 7011 2000 0000 9007 6113), Stephanie Reither, USCIS Columbus Office Director, 395 E. Main Street, Columbus, Ohio 43215 (Article No. 7011 2000 0000 9007 6106), Kevin K. McAleenan, Acting Secretary, Dept. of Homeland Security, Washington, DC 20528 (Article No. 7011 2000 0000 9007 7219) and Kenneth Cuccinelli, Director of USCI, Dept. of Homeland Security, Washington, DC 20528(Article No. 7011 2000 0000 9007 6090) (mdr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Attorney General Of The United States, Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Columbus Field Office Director, USCIS, Director, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mdr)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (mdr)
September 13, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Salwan A. Shafeay of civil cover sheet (DiFranco, Brian)
September 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Naturalization against Attorney General Of The United States, Department of Homeland Security, USCIS Columbus Field Office Director, USCIS, Director ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7106527), filed by Salwan A. Shafeay. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (DiFranco, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shafeay v. USCIS Columbus Field Office Director et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney General Attorney General Of The United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS, Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: USCIS Columbus Field Office Director
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Salwan A. Shafeay
Represented By: Brian C DiFranco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?