Gantz v. Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC
Plaintiff: Kira Gantz
Defendant: Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04170
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The October 9, 2019 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 12/1/2019. Motions to Amend due by 12/1/2019. Initial Disclosures due by 10/30/2019. Discovery (Fact) due by 6/30/2020. Dispositive motions due by 7/30/2020. Primary Expert due by 5/1/2020. Rebuttal Expert due by 6/1/2020. Settlement Demand due by 10/2/2019. Response to Settlement Demand due by 10/16/2019. Mediation Deadline: 7/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 10/2/2019. (daf)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Kira Gantz. (Hux, James)
September 25, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #2 Complaint filed by Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC. (Hoffman, Jocelyn)
September 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/9/2019 04:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. (agm)
September 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC answer due 10/1/2019. (jlk)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC, filed by Kira Gantz. (jlk)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Franklin County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV-08-6680 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7117156), filed by Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit) (Hoffman, Jocelyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gantz v. Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kira Gantz
Represented By: James J Hux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bob Evans Restaurants, LLC
Represented By: Jocelyn M Hoffman
Represented By: Jonathan Ross Vaughn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?