Alaheri v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Plaintiff: Alaheri Alaheri
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC dba MR. COOPER and Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04257
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Banks and Banking
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiff Alaheri Alaheri. (Kohl, Sean)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Nationstar Mortgage, LLC. (Sandy, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/5/2019 11:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
October 14, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by James W Sandy for Defendant Nationstar Mortgage, LLC (Sandy, James)
October 14, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Nationstar Mortgage, LLC on 9/24/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Kohl, Sean)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC dba MR. COOPER ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7122448), filed by Alaheri Alaheri. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Kohl, Sean)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alaheri v. Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaheri Alaheri
Represented By: Sean M. Kohl
Represented By: Timothy J Cook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE, LLC dba MR. COOPER
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nationstar Mortgage, LLC
Represented By: James W Sandy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?