Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Estate of Lynda M. Perry et al
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Defendant: Jeffrey Perry, Kathryn M. Perry, Allison Perry and Estate of Lynda M. Perry
Case Number: 2:2019cv04263
Filed: September 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Intervenor Complaint, filed by Estate of Lynda M. Perry. (Aveni, Carl)
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Allison Perry on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Downey, Brian)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION Deposit Funds Into Court's Registry by Plaintiff Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support of Motion, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (Downey, Brian)
October 16, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Estate of Lynda M. Perry answer due 12/6/2019. (daf)
October 10, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Estate of Lynda M. Perry on 10/7/2019, answer due 12/6/2019. (Downey, Brian) Modified text on 10/16/2019 (daf).
September 25, 2019 Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson added. (er)
September 24, 2019 Filing 1 Intervenor COMPLAINT , filed by Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A -- Detainer Capias, #3 Exhibit B -- Policy, #4 Exhibit C -- Beneficiary Details, #5 Exhibit D -- Certificate of Death and Supplementary Medical Certification, #6 Exhibit E -- Criminal Docket) (Downey, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company v. Estate of Lynda M. Perry et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathryn M. Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allison Perry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Lynda M. Perry
Represented By: Carl A Aveni, II
Represented By: Alan Kendal Veatch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hartford Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Brian P Downey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?