Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Masonry Contracting Corporation
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Defendant: Masonry Contracting Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv04330
Filed: September 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/12/2019 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please Note:The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm)
November 20, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, filed by Masonry Contracting Corporation. (Leneghan, David)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Masonry Contracting Corporation. Masonry Contracting Corporation served on 10/30/2019, answer due 11/20/2019. (mdr)
October 22, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by Clerk of a copy of the Summons and Complaint via Certified Mail (Article No. 7016 1971 0000 5806 0695) on Defendant, Masonry Contracting Corp., c/o Matthew Birch, PO Box 224, Bath, Ohio 44210. (mdr)
September 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Masonry Contracting Corporation. (mdr)
September 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Masonry Contracting Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7130779), filed by Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Ball, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits v. Masonry Contracting Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Boards of Trustees of the Ohio Laborers Benefits
Represented By: Steven Louis Ball
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Masonry Contracting Corporation
Represented By: David M Leneghan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?