UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Heck
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: Jimmy D Heck
Case Number: 2:2019cv04417
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by Jimmy D Heck. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Bankruptcy Filing) (Sheppard, Kenneth)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons returned executed. Personal Service regarding the Summons and Complaint served on Jimmy D. Heck on October 14, 2019, filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Stallings, Mary) Modified text on 10/28/2019 (jlk).
October 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Jimmy D Heck. (jlk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Jimmy D Heck, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Stallings, Mary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. Heck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jimmy D Heck
Represented By: Kenneth L Sheppard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Mary A. Stallings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?