Wile v. The Huntington National Bank et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wile
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank and Huntington BancShares Incorporated
Case Number: 2:2019cv04530
Filed: October 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29:2617
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 ALIAS SUMMONS Returned Executed: Huntington BancShares Incorporated served on 11/29/2019, answer due 12/20/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (kk2)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of Mailing By Clerk: Summons & Complaint sent by certified mail to Huntington BancShares Incorporated. (sem)
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 Alias Summons Issued as to Huntington BancShares Incorporated. (sem)
November 25, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Probst, Erica)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint filed by The Huntington National Bank and Huntington Bancshares Incorporated. (Kilgard-Schnupp, Celia) Modified text on 11/8/2019 (sem).
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed: The Huntington National Bank served on 10/17/2019, answer due 11/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certified Mail Receipt Return) (kk2)
October 15, 2019 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Mailing By Clerk: Summons & Complaint sent by certified mail to The Huntington National Bank & Huntington BancShares Incorporated (kk2)
October 11, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Huntington BancShares Incorporated and The Huntington National Bank. (er)
October 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Huntington National Bank, filed by Jennifer Wile. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form summons, #3 Summons Form summons) (Probst, Erica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wile v. The Huntington National Bank et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Huntington National Bank
Represented By: Celia M Kilgard-Schnupp
Represented By: Sarah Crabtree Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Huntington BancShares Incorporated
Represented By: Celia M Kilgard-Schnupp
Represented By: Sarah Crabtree Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Wile
Represented By: Erica Ann Probst
Represented By: Michael P. Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?