Crane v. Pacific Associates Corp.
Plaintiff: Christopher Crane
Defendant: Pacific Associates Corp., Shain Mercer and John Does 1-3
Case Number: 2:2019cv04632
Filed: October 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - Case reported settled. The 11/26/2019 at 10:30 AM PPTC is VACATED. Status Report due by 12/27/2019, unless dismissal filed prior. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers on 11/21/2019. (sln)
October 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/26/2019 10:30 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
October 18, 2019 Case transferred in from Western Division at Cincinnati on 10/18/2019. Case Number 1:19-cv-877. Case assigned to Judge Edmund A. Sargus and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (eh)
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 10/18/2019. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the Eastern Division at Columbus. (eh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Pacific Associates Corp. (eh)
October 18, 2019 Filing 3 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND originally filed 9/23/2019 in Licking County Court of Common Pleas (Case No. 19CV01003) by Christopher Crane against Shain Mercer, Pacific Associates Corp., and John Does 1-3. (eh)
October 17, 2019 Filing 2 ANSWER to Complaint filed by All Defendants. (Loepp, Thomas)
October 17, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Licking County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19CV01003 ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7157613), filed by Pacific Associates Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Corporate Disclosure, #3 State Court Complaint) (Loepp, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crane v. Pacific Associates Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pacific Associates Corp.
Represented By: Thomas C. Loepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shain Mercer
Represented By: Thomas C. Loepp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Crane
Represented By: David B Schultz
Represented By: Jeremiah E Heck
Represented By: Brian M Garvine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?