Progressive Health and Rehab Corp. v. Medcare Staffing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Progressive Health and Rehab Corp.
Defendant: Medcare Staffing, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04710
Filed: October 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Extension of Time: Answer due 1/20/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/18/2019. (ew)
December 17, 2019 Filing 17 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, New date requested 1/20/2020. by Defendant Medcare Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Maher, Kristine)
December 11, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Defendant Medcare Staffing, Inc. of Subpoena (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Subpoena to Charter Communications) (Maher, Kristine)
December 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Pursuant to #13 Stipulated Extension, Medcare Staffing, Inc. answer due 12/20/2019. (jlk)
November 27, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Frank Matthew Schultz for Defendant Medcare Staffing, Inc. (Schultz, Frank)
November 27, 2019 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Medcare Staffing, Inc.. (Maher, Kristine)
November 27, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION Request for Extension of Time to Move or Plead by Defendant Medcare Staffing, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Maher, Kristine)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Kristine Maher for Defendant Medcare Staffing, Inc. (Maher, Kristine)
November 22, 2019 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Medcare Staffing, Inc.. Medcare Staffing, Inc. served on 11/8/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Doogan, Jessica)
November 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTATION ORDER - granting #9 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Ryan M. Kelly. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on November 20, 2019. (jlk)
November 19, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7207452) of Ryan M. Kelly by Plaintiff Progressive Health and Rehab Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 Summons Reissued as to Medcare Staffing, Inc. (jlk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF NON-ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS re #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. (jlk)
November 6, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re #4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7181290) of Ryan M. Kelly (jlk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (DeRose, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7181290) of Ryan M. Kelly by Plaintiff Progressive Health and Rehab Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (DeRose, Robert)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Medcare Staffing, Inc. (jlk)
October 24, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Certify Class and Brief In Support by Plaintiff Progressive Health and Rehab Corp.. (DeRose, Robert)
October 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Medcare Staffing, Inc. ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7170307), filed by Progressive Health and Rehab Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form, #3 Exhibit A and B) (DeRose, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Progressive Health and Rehab Corp. v. Medcare Staffing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medcare Staffing, Inc.
Represented By: Kristine Maher
Represented By: Frank Matthew Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Progressive Health and Rehab Corp.
Represented By: Robert E DeRose, II
Represented By: Ryan M. Kelly
Represented By: Jessica R. Doogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?