PharMerica East, LLC v. Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Plaintiff: PharMerica East, LLC d/b/a PharMerica and PharMerica East, LLC
Defendant: Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC d/b/a Flint Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation and Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Case Number: 2:2019cv04762
Filed: October 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 6 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC. (er)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 Application to Clerk for entry of default against Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC d/b/a Flint Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Affidavit of Elizabeth B. Noland) (Noland, Elizabeth)
November 27, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC. Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC served on 11/4/2019, answer due 11/25/2019. (Noland, Elizabeth)
October 29, 2019 Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 200COL059291 (daf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC. (daf)
October 28, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiffs PharMerica East, LLC d/b/a PharMerica, PharMerica East, LLC d/b/a PharMerica identifying Corporate Parent PharMerica East, LLC d/b/a PharMerica for PharMerica East, LLC d/b/a PharMerica.. (Alphin, Elizabeth)
October 28, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC d/b/a Flint Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation, filed by PharMerica East, LLC d/b/a PharMerica. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Alphin, Elizabeth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PharMerica East, LLC v. Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PharMerica East, LLC d/b/a PharMerica
Represented By: Elizabeth Brown Alphin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PharMerica East, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Brown Noland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC d/b/a Flint Ridge Nursing and Rehabilitation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Generation Health & Rehabilitation Center LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?