Rondevoo Technologies LLC v. Deep Lens, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rondevoo Technologies LLC
Defendant: Deep Lens, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2019cv04771
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Edmund A Sargus
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15:1126
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Deep Lens, Inc.. (LeVere, T. Earl)
December 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by T. Earl LeVere for Defendant Deep Lens, Inc. (LeVere, T. Earl)
November 19, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE by Plaintiff Rondevoo Technologies LLC re #6 Waiver of Service Executed (Wernow, Howard)
November 19, 2019 Filing 6 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Deep Lens, Inc. on 11/19/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Wernow, Howard)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Defendant Deep Lens, Inc.. The Defendant was served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (daf)
November 5, 2019 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Mailing by the Clerk: A Copy of the Complaint and Issued Summons was sent to the named Defendant via certified mail. (daf)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Rondevoo Technologies LLC. (Wernow, Howard)
October 30, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Deep Lens, Inc.. (daf)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Deep Lens, Inc., filed by Rondevoo Technologies LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-US Patent 7,088,854, #2 Exhibit B-US Patent 7,254,266, #3 Exhibit C-US Patent 8,687,879, #4 Exhibit D-Patent 854 Claim Chart, #5 Exhibit E-Patent 266 Claim Chart, #6 Exhibit F-Patent 879 Claim Chart, #7 Civil Cover Sheet, #8 Summons Form) (Wernow, Howard)
October 29, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number 0648-7177047 (daf)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rondevoo Technologies LLC v. Deep Lens, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rondevoo Technologies LLC
Represented By: Howard L. Wernow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deep Lens, Inc.
Represented By: T. Earl LeVere
Represented By: Roger Allen Gilcrest
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?