Amos v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: Ronald R Amos
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 2:2019cv04803
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: George C Smith
Referring Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 11, 2019 Filing 13 The Clerk's Office has provided sealed access to counsel to file the administrative record under seal pursuant to #11 (daf)
December 11, 2019 Filing 12 Sealed access was granted by the Court to permit counsel to file the administrative record under seal pursuant to #11 . (daf)
December 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL ORDER: The December 16, 2019 preliminary pretrial conference is VACATED. Joinder of Parties due by 1/8/2020. Motions to Amend due by 1/8/2020. Administrative Record Deadline (for ERISA cases) due by 2/1/2020. Dispositive motions due by 5/29/2020. Responses due by 6/30/2020 Settlement Demand due by 1/25/2020. Response to Settlement Demand due by 2/10/2020. Mediation Deadline: 3/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/11/2019. (daf)
December 9, 2019 Filing 10 RULE 26(f) REPORT by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/16/2019 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura. Please Note: The Rule 26(f) Report for the Eastern Division has changed. Please ensure that you are using the correct form. (agm)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTATION ORDER granting #3 Motion to Appoint Attorney Iwana Rademaekers as Trial Attorney. By Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/7/2019. (agm)
November 7, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #4 Complaint filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Rademaekers, Iwana)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston Supplemental Civil Cover Sheet (Riepenhoff, David)
November 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston answer due 11/7/2019. (mdr)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTATION ORDER Granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Iwana Rademaekers entered by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/01/2019. (mdr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 4 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston filed in the Washington County Common Pleas Court on October 2, 2019 as Case No. 19OT000222 filed by Ronald R Amos. (mdr)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION to Appoint Counsel Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston's Motion to Appoint Trial Counsel by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Riepenhoff, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee of $200 paid, receipt number 0648-7181331) of Iwana Rademaekers by Defendant Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Iwana Rademaekers' List of Courts Admitted, #2 Iwana Rademaekers admitted and license by the Supreme Court of Texas) (Riepenhoff, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL to the Federal District Court from Washington County Court of Common Pleas, case number 19OT000222, filed by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (Attachments: #1 Complaint from Washington County Case, #2 Summons from Washington County Case, #3 Court View 19OT000222, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Corporate Disclosure) (Riepenhoff, David)
October 31, 2019 Filing Fee Received: $400. Receipt Number: 0648-7180862. (ew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amos v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: David Alan Riepenhoff
Represented By: Iwana Rademaekers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R Amos
Represented By: Tony C Merry
Represented By: Lesley H Kuhl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?