Armstead v. Baldwin et al
Plaintiff: Demarco Armstead
Defendant: Dep Carmen, Sgt. Obrien, Nurse Jane Doe #2, Deanna Jones, Cara Stefanko, Nurse Jane Doe #1, Dr. Jane Doe, Sheriff Dallas Baldwin, Dep Forgus, Dep Holt, Dep See, Major Bryant, Deputy Blake, Chaplin Chambers, Dep John Doe #2, Amanda Lyons, John Doe #1, Seargant Shrader, Sgt. Probst, Nurse Jane Doe #3, Dep Blade #1371, Dep Fonsworth, NaphCare, Deputy Z. Lewis, Deputy Farnsworth, Deputy Fargus, Sgt. Shroder and Chaplain Chambers
Case Number: 2:2019cv04857
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Kimberly A Jolson
Referring Judge: Sarah D Morrison
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 31, 2019 Filing 56 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION for Default Judgment against Dallas Baldwin, Blake, Blade, Bryant, Carmen, Chaplain Chambers, Fargus, Farnsworth, Holt, O'Brien, Probst, See, Schroder, and Cara Stefanki filed by Defendant Dallas Baldwin. (Marziale, Arthur)
December 27, 2019 Filing 55 RESPONSE to Motion re #5 MOTION for Protective Order Response to Plaintiff's Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Restraining Order [Doc. 6 ] filed by Defendants Deanna Jones, Amanda Lyons, NaphCare, Cara Stefanko. (Hojnoski, Robert)
December 27, 2019 Filing 54 RESPONSE in Opposition re #49 MOTION for Summary Judgment and MOTION for Default Judgment against Dallas Baldwin, Blake, Blade, Bryant, Carmen, Chaplain Chambers, Fargus, Farnsworth, Holt, O'Brien, Probst, See, Schroder, and Cara Stefanki & #48 MOTION for Summary Judgment and MOTION for Default Judgment against Amanda Lyons filed by Defendants Deanna Jones, Amanda Lyons, NaphCare, Cara Stefanko. (Hojnoski, Robert) Modified text on 12/30/2019 (kk2)
December 27, 2019 Filing 53 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Deanna Jones, Amanda Lyons, NaphCare, Cara Stefanko. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Criminal case, #2 Exhibit Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 Exhibit Magistrate's Decision) (Hojnoski, Robert)
December 23, 2019 Filing 52 RESPONSE in Opposition re #45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 6 Emergency Ex-Parte MOTION for Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 23, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION to File Document Under Seal and Seal All Exhibits Already Filed by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 23, 2019 Filing 50 ANSWER to #23 Complaint, on Behalf of County Defendants filed by Dallas Baldwin. (Marziale, Arthur)
December 23, 2019 Filing 49 MOTION for Summary Judgment & MOTION for Default Judgment against Dallas Baldwin, Blake, Blade, Bryant, Carmen, Chaplain Chambers, Fargus, Farnsworth, Holt, O'Brien, Probst, See, Schroder, and Cara Stefanki by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 23, 2019 Filing 48 MOTION for Summary Judgment & MOTION for Default Judgment against Amanda Lyons by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 18, 2019 Filing 47 Summons Issued as to NaphCare. (ew)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: Defendants Motion for Extension of Time ( #45 ) is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. It is RECOMMENDED that Plaintiff's Motion to Amend ( #29 ) be GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk is DIRECTED to add NaphCare and Deputy Z. Lewis as Defendants. The United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve NaphCare by certified mail. Plaintiff is DIRECTED to complete the attached summons form for Deputy Z. Lewis. Once it is returned, the United States Marshal is DIRECTED to serve Defendant Deputy Z. Lewis. Defendant NaphCare is DIRECTED to respond to 6 within 14 days of service. Objections to R&R due by 1/2/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/18/2019. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form, #2 USM-285) (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 17, 2019 Filing 45 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 6 Emergency Ex-Parte MOTION for Restraining Order by Defendants Deanna Jones, Amanda Lyons, Cara Stefanko. New date requested 1/7/2020. (Hojnoski, Robert) Modified on 12/18/2019 to correct text, ECF filing event, and add doc link to TRO motion (kk2)
December 17, 2019 Filing 44 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert W Hojnoski for Defendants Deanna Jones, Amanda Lyons, Cara Stefanko (Hojnoski, Robert)
December 17, 2019 Filing 43 RESPONSE to Motion re #29 MOTION to Amend/Correct #23 Complaint, filed by Defendants Dallas Baldwin, Sgt Shroder, See, Probst, Obrien, Holt, Deputy Farnsworth, Deputy Fargus, Deputy Chambers, Carmen, Bryant, Blake, Blade #1371. (Marziale, Arthur) Modified filing parties on 12/18/2019 (kk2)
December 17, 2019 Filing 42 Supplement to #23 Original Complaint by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 17, 2019 Filing 39 MOTION to Correct Defendant Name by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 17, 2019 Filing 38 MOTION to File Documents Under Seal by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER granting #36 Motion to File Document Under Seal: Defendants may file Exhibits A and B to their Response to Plaintiff's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/17/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
December 16, 2019 Filing 36 First MOTION to File Document Under Seal Exhibits A & B to Doc. #35 by Defendants Dallas Baldwin, Blade #1371, Blake, Bryant, Carmen, Chaplain Chambers, Deputy Fargus, Deputy Farnsworth, Holt, Jane Doe, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Deanna Jones, Amanda Lyons, Obrien, Probst, See, Sgt. Shroder, Cara Stefanko. (Marziale, Arthur) Modified text & filing event on 12/17/2019 (kk2)
December 16, 2019 Filing 35 Second RESPONSE in Opposition re 6 Emergency Ex-Parte MOTION for Restraining Order filed by Defendants Dallas Baldwin, Blade #1371, Blake, Bryant, Carmen, Chaplain Chambers, Deputy Fargus, Deputy Farnsworth, Holt, Jane Doe, Jane Doe #1, Jane Doe #2, Jane Doe #3, John Doe #1, John Doe #2, Deanna Jones, Amanda Lyons, Obrien, Probst, See, Sgt. Shroder, Cara Stefanko. (Marziale, Arthur) Modified text & document link on 12/17/2019 (kk2)
December 16, 2019 Filing 34 Supplemental BRIEF Memorandum re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order & 6 MOTION for Bond by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Statement of Facts, #2 Envelope) (kk2)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER: Defendants are DIRECTED to file a supplemental memorandum in support of their #31 response to Plaintiff's 6 Motion no later than December 16, 2019, addressing Plaintiff's factual allegations regarding his life-sustaining medication. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 12/10/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) Modified text on 12/11/2019 to add doc links (kk2)
December 9, 2019 Filing 32 NOTICE of Appearance by Arthur James Marziale, Jr for Defendants Dallas Baldwin, Blade #1371, Blake, Bryant, Carmen, Chaplain Chambers, Deputy Fargus, Deputy Farnsworth, Holt, Obrien, Probst, See, Sgt. Shroder (Marziale, Arthur) Modified filing parties on 12/18/2019 (kk2)
December 9, 2019 Filing 31 Response to Plaintiff's 6 Motion for TRO Against County Defendants by Defendant Dallas Baldwin. (Marziale, Arthur) Modified text on 12/9/2019 (sem).
December 6, 2019 Filing 30 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons by Clerk of Southern District of Ohio (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (kk2)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification)
December 6, 2019 Filing 29 MOTION to Amend #23 Complaint to Add Naphcare Inc, Techcare Inc, The Franklin County Commissioners, and Deputy Z. Lewis as Defendants by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Envelope) (kk2)
December 6, 2019 Filing 28 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE re #27 Objection to Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
December 6, 2019 Filing 27 OBJECTION to #22 Report and Recommendations by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 27, 2019 Filing 26 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons as to Deanna Jones. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE of Non-Issuance of Summons as to Franklin County Commissioners, Techcare, and Naphcare. (Attachments: #1 Summons Form) (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 27, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to Dallas Baldwin, Blade #1371, Blake, Bryant, Carmen, Chaplain Chambers, Deputy Fargus, Deputy Farnsworth, Holt, Amanda Lyons, Obrien, Probst, See, Sgt. Shroder, and Cara Stefanko. (ew)
November 27, 2019 Filing 23 COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Demarco Armstead. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Evidence, #2 Exhibit Key, #3 Exhibits 1-145, #4 Additional Exhibits, #5 Supplemental Affidavit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum) (ew)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION and ORDER: Magistrate Judge GRANTS #11 Motion Requesting Service by U.S. Marshal and #19 Motion to Correct the Names of Defendants; DENIES #5 Motion for Protective Order, #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel, #8 Motion for Oral Argument, #9 Motion for Fictious Name Status, and #10 Motion for Consideration; and RECOMMENDS denying #4 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction. Response to 6 Emergency Ex Parte Motion for Restraining Order due by 12/9/2019. Objections to R&R due by 12/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kimberly A. Jolson on 11/27/2019. (ew)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 18, 2019 Filing 21 REQUEST for Issuance of Summons. (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (ew)
November 18, 2019 Filing 20 Supporting BRIEF Memorandum Addendum re 6 MOTION for Bond by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 18, 2019 Filing 19 MOTION to Correct the Names of Defendants by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 18, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT re #17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 18, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead (Attachments: #1 Envelope) (kk2)
November 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline (IFP and summons forms) by 12/6/2019. (er)
November 6, 2019 Filing 16 CLERK'S DEFICIENCY NOTICE on Summons forms. (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 CLERK'S DEFICIENCY NOTICE on IFP. (Attachments: #1 IFP form) (er)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.)
November 4, 2019 Filing 14 Letter 3 from Demarco Armstead addressed to the Court. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 13 Letter 2 from Demarco Armstead addressed to the Court. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 12 Letter 1 from Demarco Armstead addressed to the Court. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION Requesting Service by U.S. Marshal by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Consideration and Memorandum by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION for Fictious Name Status as Plaintiff and Sealed Record by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Oral Argument & Memorandum by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order/Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 3 Demand for a Jury Trial filed by Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT of Civil Actions by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (er)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis (The following document(s) were not submitted to the Office of the Clerk: Summons forms, a prepared ifp form) by Plaintiff Demarco Armstead. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Indigency, #2 Complaint, #3 Memorandum of Evidence, #4 Exhibit Key, #5 Ex 1-10, #6 Ex 11-20, #7 Ex 21-30, #8 Ex 31-40, #9 Ex 41-50, #10 Ex 51-60, #11 Ex 61-70, #12 Ex 71-80, #13 Ex 81-90, #14 Ex 91-100, #15 Ex 101-110, #16 Ex 111-120, #17 Ex 121-130, #18 Ex 131-140, #19 Ex 141-145, #20 Additional Exhibits, #21 Supplemental Affidavit to Ea, #22 Civil Cover Sheet, #23 Civil Cover Sheet Addendum, #24 Envelope - Side 1, #25 Envelope - Side 2, #26 USM Forms) (er)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Armstead v. Baldwin et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep Carmen
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Obrien
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Jones
Represented By: Robert W Hojnoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cara Stefanko
Represented By: Robert W Hojnoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Jane Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff Dallas Baldwin
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep Forgus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep Holt
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep See
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Major Bryant
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Blake
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplin Chambers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep John Doe #2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amanda Lyons
Represented By: Robert W Hojnoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe #1
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seargant Shrader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Probst
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nurse Jane Doe #3
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep Blade #1371
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dep Fonsworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NaphCare
Represented By: Robert W Hojnoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Z. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Farnsworth
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Fargus
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Shroder
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Chambers
Represented By: Arthur James Marziale, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Demarco Armstead
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?