Patterson v. First Advantage Background Services Corporation
Plaintiff: Brandon Patterson
Defendant: First Advantage Background Services Corporation
Case Number: 2:2019cv04882
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: James L Graham
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 3, 2019 Filing 3 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to First Advantage Background Services Corporation on 11/22/2019, answer due 1/21/2020. (Dooley, Matthew)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to First Advantage Background Services Corporation. (mdr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against First Advantage Background Services Corporation ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7188809), filed by Brandon Patterson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Form) (Dooley, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patterson v. First Advantage Background Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Advantage Background Services Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Patterson
Represented By: Matthew A Dooley
Represented By: Geoffrey H Baskerville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?