Oro BRC4, LLC v. Silvertree Apartments, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Oro BRC4, LLC
Defendant: Karric South Apartments, Inc., Silvertree Apartments, Inc., Karric North Apartments, Inc., Springburn Apartments, Inc., John Doe Net Worth Affiliate and John and Jane Does 1-15, John Doe Corporations 1-15, and Other John Doe Entities 1-15
Case Number: 2:2019cv04907
Filed: November 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Ohio
Presiding Judge: Elizabeth Preston Deavers
Referring Judge: Algenon L Marbley
2 Judge: Sarah D Morrison
3 Judge: Chelsey M Vascura
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 19, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/18/2019 11:00 AM in Teleconference before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers. (sln)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RELATED CASE MEMORANDUM ORDER: The Judges agree that this case and case number 2:19-cv-4375 ARE related. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Preston Deavers for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Algenon L. Marbley on December 2, 2019. (jlk)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by James Edward Arnold for Defendants Karric North Apartments, Inc., Karric South Apartments, Inc., Silvertree Apartments, Inc., Springburn Apartments, Inc. (Arnold, James)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Palmer, Lucas)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Palmer, Lucas)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Palmer, Lucas)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. (Palmer, Lucas)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ***SEE 11/13/2019 CORRECTIVE ENTRY*** - WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Karric North Apartments, Inc. on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Karric South Apartments, Inc. on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Silvertree Apartments, Inc. on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020; Springburn Apartments, Inc. on 11/7/2019, answer due 1/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons, #2 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons, #3 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons, #4 Exhibit Waiver of Service of Summons) (Palmer, Lucas) Modified on 11/13/2019 (kk2).
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Karric North Apartments, Inc. (Arnold, James)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Karric South Apartments, Inc. (Arnold, James)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Springburn Apartments, Inc. (Arnold, James)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Defendant Silvertree Apartments, Inc. (Arnold, James) Modified on 11/13/2019 to remove corporate parent info (kk2)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order NOTICE of Appearance by Damion M Clifford for Defendants Karric North Apartments Inc, Karric South Apartments Inc, Silvertree Apartments Inc, and Springburn Apartments Inc.SEE DOCKET #14 FOR DOCUMENT (kk2)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed: Waivers sent to Karric North Apartments Inc, Karric South Apartments Inc, Silvertree Apartments Inc, and Springburn Apartments Inc on 11/8/2019, answers due 1/7/2020SEE DOCKET #s #9 - #13 FOR DOCUMENTS. This entry is being created to enter the correct waiver sent and answer due dates for each party. (kk2)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Oro BRC4, LLC. (Palmer, Lucas)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE by Plaintiff Oro BRC4, LLC re #1 Complaint of Civil Cover Sheet (Palmer, Lucas)
November 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 paid - receipt number: 0648-7191317), filed by Oro BRC4, LLC. (Palmer, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Ohio Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Oro BRC4, LLC v. Silvertree Apartments, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karric South Apartments, Inc.
Represented By: Damion M Clifford
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvertree Apartments, Inc.
Represented By: Damion M Clifford
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karric North Apartments, Inc.
Represented By: Damion M Clifford
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Springburn Apartments, Inc.
Represented By: Damion M Clifford
Represented By: James Edward Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Net Worth Affiliate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John and Jane Does 1-15, John Doe Corporations 1-15, and Other John Doe Entities 1-15
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oro BRC4, LLC
Represented By: Lucas K Palmer
Represented By: David Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?